Green v. Persolve Legal Group LLP et al
Plaintiff: Autumn Green
Defendant: Persolve LLC, Persolve Legal Group LLP and Persolve Recoveries LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00674
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 7/8/21. (SAC)
July 6, 2021 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hess, Joshua)
June 17, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Persolve LLC, Persolve Legal Group LLP, Persolve Recoveries LLC.(Hess, Joshua)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS Defendants Persolve Legal Group, LLP, Persolve, LLC, and Persolve Recoveries, LLCs, second unopposed motion for an extension of time. (Doc. 7). Defendants SHALL file a responsive pleading on or before June 17, 2021. The court will grant no further extensions. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/1/2021. (KAM)
June 1, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Persolve LLC, Persolve Legal Group LLP, Persolve Recoveries LLC. (Hess, Joshua)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS Defendants Persolve Legal Group LLP, Persolve, LLC, and Persolve Recoveries, LLC's, unopposed motion for an extension of time. (Doc. #5 ). Defendants SHALL file responsive pleadings on or before June 3, 2021. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 5/17/2021. (KEK)
May 14, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Persolve LLC, Persolve Legal Group LLP, Persolve Recoveries LLC. (Hess, Joshua)
May 13, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Persolve Legal Group LLP. filed by Persolve Legal Group LLP (Hess, Joshua)
May 13, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Persolve Recoveries LLC. filed by Persolve Recoveries LLC (Hess, Joshua)
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Persolve LLC. filed by Persolve LLC (Hess, Joshua)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Persolve LLC from Circuit Court of Talladega County, Alabama, case number 61-cv-2021-90099, filed by Persolve LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KEK)
May 13, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3839659. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Persolve LLC from Circuit Court of Talladega County, Alabama, case number 61-cv-2021-90099, filed by Persolve LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(KEK). (Hess, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Persolve Legal Group LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Persolve LLC
Represented By: John David Collins
Represented By: Joshua R Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Persolve Legal Group LLP
Represented By: John David Collins
Represented By: Joshua R Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Persolve Recoveries LLC
Represented By: John David Collins
Represented By: Joshua R Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Autumn Green
Represented By: M Stan Herring, Jr
Represented By: John G Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?