Laymon v. AVI Foodsystems Inc et al
Plaintiff: Linda J Laymon
Defendant: AVI Foodsystems Inc, AVI Foodsystems Inc Welfare Plan and Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv01095
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1362
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AVI Foodsystems Inc. filed by AVI Foodsystems Inc (Childers, Rachel)
October 5, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AVI Foodsystems Inc Welfare Plan. filed by AVI Foodsystems Inc Welfare Plan (Childers, Rachel)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to Ms. Laymon's complaint #1 on or before November 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 10/5/2021. (KEK)
October 5, 2021 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Other Responsive Pleading by AVI Foodsystems Inc, AVI Foodsystems Inc Welfare Plan. (Childers, Rachel)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Company's #8 motion for an extension of time to file an answer. Defendant Aetna's answer is due on or before October 20, 2021. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/20/221. (KEK)
September 20, 2021 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Wahlheim, William)
August 30, 2021 Filing 7 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Aetna Life Insurance Company. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
August 27, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Linda J Laymon as to Aetna Life Insurance Company. (KEK)
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Linda J Laymon. AVI Foodsystems Inc Welfare Plan waiver sent on 8/11/2021, answer due 10/10/2021. (Williams, Miles)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Linda J Laymon. AVI Foodsystems Inc waiver sent on 8/11/2021, answer due 10/10/2021. (Williams, Miles)
August 13, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Aetna Life Insurance Company. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Linda J Laymon. (KEK)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AVI Foodsystems Inc, AVI Foodsystems Inc Welfare Plan, Aetna Life Insurance Company, filed by Linda J Laymon.(KEK)
August 11, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3902008. related document #1 COMPLAINT against AVI Foodsystems Inc, AVI Foodsystems Inc Welfare Plan, Aetna Life Insurance Company, filed by Linda J Laymon.(KEK). (Williams, Miles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laymon v. AVI Foodsystems Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda J Laymon
Represented By: Miles Clayborn Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVI Foodsystems Inc
Represented By: Rachel Elise Childers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVI Foodsystems Inc Welfare Plan
Represented By: Rachel Elise Childers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: John David Collins
Represented By: William B Wahlheim, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?