Cupp et al v. SoClean Inc
Plaintiff: John Cupp, Vunor Wood and Mark Wright
Defendant: SoClean Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv01309
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER-The defendant's unopposed motion to stay these proceedings in light of a motion to transfer, currently pending with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML), is GRANTED. (Doc. #6 ). The parties are ORDERED to promptly notify the court when the JPML rules on the motion to transfer. The defendant's deadline to respond to the complaint is EXTENDED to twenty-one (21) calendar days after the JPML ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/22/2021. (AKD)
October 21, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Motion is RIPE 10/21/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by SoClean Inc. (Burkhart, Charles)
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted (no signature or date on green card) by John Cupp, Vunor Wood, Mark Wright as to SoClean Inc. (KEK)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to SoClean Inc., sent via certified mail (MRR, )
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by John Cupp, Vunor Wood, Mark Wright. (Hamil, Jubal)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against SoClean Inc, filed by John Cupp, Vunor Wood, Mark Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(MRR, )
September 30, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3935305 (B4601116063). related document #1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against SoClean Inc, filed by John Cupp, Vunor Wood, Mark Wright. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(MRR, ). (Hamil, Jubal) Modified on 9/30/2021 (MRR, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cupp et al v. SoClean Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Cupp
Represented By: Jubal L Hamil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vunor Wood
Represented By: Jubal L Hamil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Wright
Represented By: Jubal L Hamil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SoClean Inc
Represented By: Charles A Burkhart
Represented By: Jason B Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?