Davis v. United States of America
Defendant: Kevin Butler
Petitioner: Delrico Lamon Davis
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv08016
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #3 MOTION FOR RULING ON ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE and the court finds that Movant Delrico Lamon Davis allegations of ineffective assistance of counsel waive the attorney-client privilege between the FPDO's office and Mr. Davis. The court ORDERS that the Government respond to the court's #2 Order to Show Cause on or before September 14, 2021. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 8/18/2021. (JLC)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER; Movant Delrico Lamon Davis has until on or before July 30, 2021 to respond to the Federal Public Defender's #3 MOTION for Ruling on Attorney-Client Privilege. The court suspends the Government's obligation to respond to the court's Order to Show Cause (doc. 2) until Mr. Davis has an opportunity to respond to the FPDO's motion. The court will issue a new deadline for the Government's response by separate order. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 7/1/2021. (JLC)
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION FOR RULING ON ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE by Kevin Butler. (Butler, Kevin)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The court hereby ORDERS the Government to appear and SHOW CAUSE in writing on or before July 30, 2021, why the court should not grant the relief requested by Mr. Davis. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 6/28/2021. (MEB2)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) in 1:19-cr-236-KOB-SGC, filed by Delrico Lamon Davis. (1:19-cr-236-KOB-SGC)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Delrico Lamon Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: William Gott Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Butler
Represented By: Kevin L Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?