Ohio Security Insurance Company v. Simmons Sign and Graphics et al
Plaintiff: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Defendant: Simmons Sign and Graphics, Tom Simmons, Devin Mass and Anne Coyle
Case Number: 1:2022cv00731
Filed: June 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard Edgar Howard on behalf of Tom Simmons, Simmons Sign and Graphics (Howard, Howard)
July 13, 2022 Filing 9 GUIDE FOR PROCEEDING WITHOUT A LAWYER (SRD)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court extends the deadlines for Simmons, Simmons Sign & Graphics, and Devin Mass to file responsive pleadings to August 12, 2022. The Court orders Simmons to file a status report on his efforts to obtain legal counsel (on behalf of himself and/or Simmons Sign & Graphics and/or Devin Mass) on or before August 5, 2022.Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 7/13/2022. (SRD)
July 8, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time by Tom Simmons. (KEK)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 7/7/2022. (SRD)
July 5, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Anne Coyle.(Phillips, Wesley)
June 22, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ohio Security Insurance Company. Devin Mass served on 6/17/2022, answer due 7/8/2022. (KEK)
June 17, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ohio Security Insurance Company. Anne Coyle served on 6/15/2022, answer due 7/6/2022; Tom Simmons served (no date on green card); Simmons Sign and Graphics served (no date on green card). (KEK)
June 14, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Anne Coyle, Devin Mass, Tom Simmons, Simmons Sign and Graphics. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
June 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(SRD)
June 10, 2022 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4105229 (ALND B4601120717) related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(SRD). (Baker, Joshua) Modified on 6/13/2022 (KEK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohio Security Insurance Company v. Simmons Sign and Graphics et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Joshua B Baker
Represented By: Joshua R Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simmons Sign and Graphics
Represented By: Howard Edgar Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Simmons
Represented By: Howard Edgar Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin Mass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Coyle
Represented By: Wesley L Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?