Bolong v. Lassiter et al
Plaintiff: Sisso Ho Bolong
Defendant: Destiny Lassiter and B Ward
Case Number: 1:2022cv00990
Filed: August 8, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - For the reasons stated within, the court RECOMMENDS that all claims in this action be DISMISSED without prejudice. The plaintiff may file specific written objections to this report and recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 10/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 9/26/2022. (MEB2)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - The plaintiff filed a complaint pursuant to Bivens v. Six Unknown Names Agents, 403 U.S. 388 (1971). The complaint is deficient for the reasons indicated below. The plaintiff must correct this deficiency within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 8/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application (MEB2)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re: case number. (KEK)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Destiny Lassiter, B Ward, filed by Sisso Ho Bolong.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bolong v. Lassiter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sisso Ho Bolong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Destiny Lassiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?