Chevis v. United States of America
Petitioner: Dontae Larun Chevis
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2022cv08038
Filed: November 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2022 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Petitioner Dontae Larun Chevis's Motion to Vacate filed by United States of America. (Doc. 28 in Case No. 1:19-cr-293-CLM-JHE. Filed in this case pursuant to #4 Order on 12/12/2022.) (SRD)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER The United States has filed a response to Petitioner Dontae Larun Chevis's motion to vacate in Petitioner's underlying criminal case. (See Doc. 28 in Case No. 1:19-cr-293-CLM-JHE). The court DIRECTS the Clerk to docket the response in this civil action. And the court gives Chevis until Tuesday, January 3, 2023 to reply to the Government's response. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 12/12/2022. (SRD, )
December 5, 2022 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (return to sender-inmate not in facility). Mail sent to Dontae Chevis. (KSS)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER The court ORDERS that the United States appear and file its answer in accordance with Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2255 Proceedings by Friday, December 9, 2022. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 11/18/2022. (SRD)
November 15, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Dontae Larun Chevis.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chevis v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dontae Larun Chevis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Prim F. Escalona, US Attorney
Represented By: M Blake Milner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?