Mack v. Talladega College
Plaintiff: Angela Mack
Defendant: Talladega College
Case Number: 1:2023cv00119
Filed: January 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12117 ad - Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS reminding parties of their obligations under FRCP 26(f)- with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 3/10/2023. (KSS)
March 9, 2023 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Talladega College. filed by Talladega College (Smith, Kyle)
March 9, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Talladega College.(Smith, Kyle)
February 21, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angela Mack. Talladega College served on 2/16/2023, answer due 3/9/2023. (Davis, Artur)
February 2, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Talladega College. Returned to Plaintiff for Service. (AKD)
January 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Talladega College, filed by Angela Mack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(SRD)
January 30, 2023 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4260285. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Talladega College, filed by Angela Mack. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(SRD). (Davis, Artur) ALND Rcpt. No: B-3461 on 1/30/2023 (SRD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mack v. Talladega College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Mack
Represented By: Artur Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talladega College
Represented By: Kyle T Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?