Butler et al v. Garland et al
Plaintiff: Don Butler, National Rifle Association of America and David Glidewell
Defendant: United States Department of Justice, Bureau of Alcohol Tobacco Firearms and Explosives, Steven Dettelbach and Merrick Garland
Case Number: 1:2024cv00975
Filed: July 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act / Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2024 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bureau of Alcohol Tobacco Firearms and Explosives, Steven Dettelbach, Merrick Garland, United States Department of Justice. (Sherwood, Zachary)
August 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court ORDERS Defendants have until on or before September 12, 2024 to file their opposition to Plaintiff's #7 motion for preliminary injunction, Plaintiffs have until on or before September 26, 2024 to file a reply in support of their motion for preliminary injunction and Defendants deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' complaint is extended until 14 days after the court rules on #7 . The Court SETS a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion and supporting briefs for Tuesday, 10/8/2024 at 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Anniston, AL before Judge Corey L Maze. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 8/29/2024. (LCB)
August 16, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Sherwood on behalf of Bureau of Alcohol Tobacco Firearms and Explosives, Steven Dettelbach, Merrick Garland, United States Department of Justice (Sherwood, Zachary)
August 15, 2024 Filing 8 Brief re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Don Butler, David Glidewell, National Rifle Association of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Don Butler, #2 Exhibit Declaration of David Glidewall)(Porter, James)
August 15, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Don Butler, David Glidewell, National Rifle Association of America. (Porter, James)
August 14, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Don Butler, National Rifle Association of America, David Glidewell. Bureau of Alcohol Tobacco Firearms and Explosives served on 8/13/2024, answer due 10/12/2024; Steven Dettelbach served on 8/13/2024, answer due 10/12/2024; Merrick Garland served on 7/28/2024, answer due 9/26/2024; United States Department of Justice served on 7/28/2024, answer due 9/26/2024. (Porter, James)
July 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Limited Admission-PHV. Attorney John Sweeney added. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 07/24/2024. (AMC)
July 22, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued by the clerk as to Bureau of Alcohol Tobacco Firearms and Explosives, Steven Dettelbach, Merrick Garland, United States Department of Justice, US Attorney's Office. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KNS)
July 22, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Don Butler, David Glidewell, National Rifle Association of America. filed by Don Butler, David Glidewell, National Rifle Association of America (Porter, James)
July 22, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Limited Admission by Don Butler, David Glidewell, National Rifle Association of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Application, #2 Exhibit B Good Standing)(Porter, James)
July 22, 2024 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 405, receipt_number AALNDC-4639024 (B-12626). related document #1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants filed by Don Butler, National Rifle Association of America, and David Glidewell.(AHI). (Porter, James) Modified on 7/22/2024 (AHI).
July 22, 2024 PHV Fee paid: $ 100, receipt number AALNDC-4639190 (B-12629). (Porter, James) Modified on 7/22/2024 (AHI).
July 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants filed by Don Butler, National Rifle Association of America, and David Glidewell.(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler et al v. Garland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Zachary Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Alcohol Tobacco Firearms and Explosives
Represented By: Zachary Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Dettelbach
Represented By: Zachary Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Represented By: Zachary Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Butler
Represented By: William Chadwick Lamar, Jr.
Represented By: James W Porter, III
Represented By: Brenton Leigh Thompson
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Rifle Association of America
Represented By: William Chadwick Lamar, Jr.
Represented By: James W Porter, III
Represented By: Brenton Leigh Thompson
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Glidewell
Represented By: William Chadwick Lamar, Jr.
Represented By: James W Porter, III
Represented By: Brenton Leigh Thompson
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?