KLINE v. PFIZER, INC.

Plaintiff: BRIAN KLINE
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv02075
Filed: October 15, 2009
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Inge P Johnson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT PLFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (DOC #33) IS DENIED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 7/20/09. ) 7/20/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/15/2009.]
January 6, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLFF KLINE'S MOTIONFOR PARTIAL RECONSIDERATIONOF THE ORDER DISMISSING COUNT V AND COUNT VI (DOC #12) IS DENIED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 1/6/09. ) 1/6/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )[Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/15/2009.]
October 31, 2008 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFT'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED WITH RESPECT TO COUNTS II, III, IV, V, VI, VIII AND IX OF PLFF'S COMPLAINT. THE MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED WITH RESPECT TO COUNTS I AND VII. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 10/31/08. ) 11/3/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/15/2009.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KLINE v. PFIZER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN KLINE
Represented By: B. Kristian W. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Represented By: RAYMOND M. WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?