Camp et al v. City of Pelham

Plaintiff: Kenneth Camp, Michael Todd McCarver, Patrick Smith, Stephen Kiel and Randal Bearden
Defendant: City of Pelham
Case Number: 2:2010cv01270
Filed: May 17, 2010
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Paul W Greene
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2014 148 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 5/1/14. (ASL)
February 28, 2014 133 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 2/28/14. (ASL)
February 1, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Having carefully reviewed and considered de novo all the materials in the court file, including the report and recommendations and the objections filed by defendant City of Pelham, the court ADOPTS the magistrate judge&# 039;s findings and ACCEPTS the magistrate judge's recommendations ( 50 and 51 ). Therefore, the court OVERRULES defendant's interposing objections to the magistrate judge's order tolling the statute of limitations and the magistrate judge's reports and recommendations. As a result, the court GRANTS plaintiffs' motion to toll the statute of limitations, 43 , plaintiffs' motion for conditional certification under the Fair Labor Standards Act, 19 , and plaintiffs' motion for certification under Rule 23 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, 27 , and APPROVES the plaintiffs'proposed notice, located in 19 .Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 02/01/13. (CVA) Modified on 2/1/2013 (CVA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camp et al v. City of Pelham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Camp
Represented By: F Inge Johnstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Todd McCarver
Represented By: F Inge Johnstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Smith
Represented By: F Inge Johnstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Kiel
Represented By: F Inge Johnstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randal Bearden
Represented By: F Inge Johnstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pelham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?