Cochran v. Five Points Temporaries LLC et al

Plaintiff: Amy Cochran
Defendant: Five Points Temporaries LLC, David McNeil and Tracy McNeil
Case Number: 2:2010cv03522
Filed: December 17, 2010
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Sharon Lovelace Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 3/4/2013. (KAM, )
September 28, 2012 72 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 9/28/2012. (KAM, )
September 27, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 9/27/2012. (KAM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cochran v. Five Points Temporaries LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Cochran
Represented By: Brandi B Frederick
Represented By: Barry V Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Points Temporaries LLC
Represented By: Jenna M Bedsole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David McNeil
Represented By: Jenna M Bedsole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy McNeil
Represented By: Jenna M Bedsole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?