Moore v. J & M Tank Lines Inc

Plaintiff: Frederick Moore
Defendant: J & M Tank Lines Inc
Case Number: 2:2011cv01000
Filed: March 17, 2011
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2013 103 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 7/3/2013. (KAM, )
March 4, 2013 97 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 3/4/13. (SAC )
September 20, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/20/12. (SAC )
August 27, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 8/27/12. (SAC )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. J & M Tank Lines Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Moore
Represented By: Cynthia F Wilkinson
Represented By: Larry R Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J & M Tank Lines Inc
Represented By: D Albert Brannen
Represented By: Walter J Kruger, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?