Vestavia Plaza LLC v. Vestavia Hills, Alabama, City of et al
Plaintiff: |
Vestavia Plaza LLC |
Defendant: |
Vestavia Hills, Alabama, City of, George Pierce, Steve Ammons, Jim Sharp, Alberto "Butch&quo Zaragoza and Rebecca Leavings |
Case Number: |
2:2011cv04152 |
Filed: |
December 9, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama |
Office: |
Southern Office |
County: |
Jefferson |
Presiding Judge: |
T Michael Putnam |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 9, 2013 |
Filing
42
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by US Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 9/9/2013. (AVC)
|
June 4, 2012 |
Filing
25
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by US Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 6/4/2012. (KAM, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Vestavia Plaza LLC v. Vestavia Hills, Alabama, City of et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Vestavia Plaza LLC |
Represented By: |
Stuart F Vargo |
Represented By: |
Daniel B Snyder |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Vestavia Hills, Alabama, City of |
Represented By: |
Benjamin T Presley |
Represented By: |
J Bentley Owens, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: George Pierce |
Represented By: |
Benjamin T Presley |
Represented By: |
J Bentley Owens, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Steve Ammons |
Represented By: |
J Bentley Owens, III |
Represented By: |
Benjamin T Presley |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Jim Sharp |
Represented By: |
J Bentley Owens, III |
Represented By: |
Benjamin T Presley |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Alberto "Butch&quo Zaragoza |
Represented By: |
J Bentley Owens, III |
Represented By: |
Benjamin T Presley |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Rebecca Leavings |
Represented By: |
J Bentley Owens, III |
Represented By: |
Benjamin T Presley |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?