United States of America et al v. AseraCare Inc et al
Plaintiff: United States of America, Debora Paradies, London Lewis and Roberta Manley
Defendant: Aseracare Inc and GGNSC Administrative Services
Movant: Dawn Richardson and Marsha Brown
Case Number: 2:2012cv00245
Filed: January 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Southern Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 497 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 3/31/2016. (AVC)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 432 MEMORANDUM OPINION REGARDING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL EVIDENTIARY RULINGS Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/15/15. (SAC )
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 268 MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 12/4/14. (SAC )
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re Defendants Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Governments Motion to Intervene (Doc. 136); for reasons as stated within, the court CONFIRMS its July 7, 2012 Order, granting the Governments Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/24/12. (SAC )
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 1/23/12: granting in part and denying in part 98 relators' Motion to Strike or for Leave to Reply; granting 62 relators' Motion to Transfer Venue; and TRANSFERRING this action to the Northern District of Alabama for further proceedings. (cc: all counsel) (nm) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 1/24/2012.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. AseraCare Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Stacy C Gerber Ward
Represented By: Lloyd C Peeples, III
Represented By: Lane H Woodke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debora Paradies
Represented By: James F Barger, Jr.
Represented By: Ronald R Brunson
Represented By: Henry I Frohsin
Represented By: Nola J Hitchcock Cross
Represented By: Noah Reinstein
Represented By: J Elliott Walthall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: London Lewis
Represented By: James F Barger, Jr.
Represented By: Ronald R Brunson
Represented By: Henry I Frohsin
Represented By: Nola J Hitchcock Cross
Represented By: Noah Reinstein
Represented By: J Elliott Walthall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Manley
Represented By: James F Barger, Jr.
Represented By: Ronald R Brunson
Represented By: Henry I Frohsin
Represented By: Nola J Hitchcock Cross
Represented By: Noah Reinstein
Represented By: J Elliott Walthall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aseracare Inc
Represented By: Charles H Bohl
Represented By: James S Christie, Jr
Represented By: Nathan A Fishbach
Represented By: Andrew A Jones
Represented By: Jack W Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGNSC Administrative Services
Represented By: Charles H Bohl
Represented By: James S Christie, Jr
Represented By: Nathan A Fishbach
Represented By: Andrew A Jones
Represented By: Jack W Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Dawn Richardson
Represented By: James F Barger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Marsha Brown
Represented By: James F Barger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?