Progressive EMU Inc v. Nutrition & Fitness Inc

Plaintiff: Progressive EMU Inc
Defendant: Nutrition & Fitness Inc
Case Number: 2:2012cv01079
Filed: April 10, 2012
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: William M Acker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2017 161 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER: as set out within 145 Defendant's Motion to Strike Pro Emu's response in opposition is DENIED; 149 Pro Emu's Motion to Accept late filing of Response and Brief in Opposition is GRANTED; 140 Pro Emu&# 039;s Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED with respect to the determination of contract termination; 146 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as it relates to the issue of the royalties due for the entire duration of the Agree ment; In all other respects, the motions are DENIED; In light of this ruling the Motion for Oral Argument 158 is MOOT; This matter is SET for a Final Pretrial Conference on 8/29/2017 at 2:00 PM; Jury Trial set for 10/2/2017 at 9:00 AM; BOTH in courtroom 4A at in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 08/09/2017. (KBB)
June 25, 2014 120 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 6/25/14. (SAC )
December 18, 2013 101 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER For reasons as noted within, Plaintiffs motion to compel and request for extension of pretrial deadlines are DENIED. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 12/18/13. (SAC )
June 7, 2013 82 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 81 MOTION for Leave to File a Limited Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Adjudication of Contract Issues filed by Nutrition & Fitness Inc. for reasons noted within; The court suggests that another stab at mediation might now be the order of the day. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 6/7/13. (SAC )
December 7, 2012 59 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: motions to compel and competing proposed protective orders submitted by the parties; the stay of discovery is LIFTED; the parties shall promptly respond to outstanding discovery requests, subject to the terms of the protective order. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 12/7/12. (KGE, )
November 5, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: briefs doc 45 and 46 ; Georgia law applies to the breach contract claims; Alabama law applies to Pro Emus declaratory judgment claims regarding intellectual property rights; and North Carolina law applies to NFIs unfair and deceptive trade practices claim and to its tortious interference claim. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 11/5/12. Associated Cases: 2:12-cv-02805-WMA, 2:12-cv-01079-WMA(KGE, )
June 26, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 6/26/12. (KGE, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progressive EMU Inc v. Nutrition & Fitness Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive EMU Inc
Represented By: David B Anderson
Represented By: Marvis L Jenkins
Represented By: Deanna L Weidner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutrition & Fitness Inc
Represented By: Stephen N Fitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?