American Safety Indemnity Company v. Fairfield Shopping Center, LLC et al
Plaintiff: American Safety Indemnity Company
Defendant: Fairfield Shopping Center, LLC, United National Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company and GE Commercial Finance Business Property Corp., ISAOA
Counter_claimant: Fairfield Shopping Center, LLC and GE Commercial Finance Business Property Corp., ISAOA
Counter_defendant: American Safety Indemnity Company
Case Number: 2:2012cv02415
Filed: July 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Southern Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Harwell G Davis
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER- For the reasons discussed within, ASIC's motion for reconsideration (Doc 84 ) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 9/12/16. (MRR, )
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER- GE's motion to strike (Doc 79 ) is DENIED; ASI's motion to exclude (Doc 88 ) is DENIED as to the allegedly undisclosed opinion the roof deteriorated beyond repair over the court of two months following November 20, 2010; The balance of ASI's motion to exclude is GRANTED; Varnado and Jerkins cannot offer the opinions stated within at trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/18/16. (MRR, )
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER- United National's motion to dismiss 14 is GRANTED, American Safety's claims against United National are DISMISSED, United National is DISMISSED as a deft; American Safety's claim against Indian Harbor is DISMISSED, Indian Harbor is DISMISSED as a deft, and Indian Harbor's motion for summary judgment 36 is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 11/20/14. (MRR )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Safety Indemnity Company v. Fairfield Shopping Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Safety Indemnity Company
Represented By: James R Bussian
Represented By: Steven J Kyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfield Shopping Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United National Insurance Company
Represented By: William Dudley Motlow, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Commercial Finance Business Property Corp., ISAOA
Represented By: Aaron G McLeod
Represented By: Stephen A Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Fairfield Shopping Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: GE Commercial Finance Business Property Corp., ISAOA
Represented By: Aaron G McLeod
Represented By: Stephen A Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: American Safety Indemnity Company
Represented By: James R Bussian
Represented By: Steven J Kyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?