Hunt v. 21st Mortgage Corporation

Plaintiff: Charles Hunt
Defendant: 21st Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 2:2012cv02697
Filed: August 14, 2012
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: William M Acker
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER For the reasons noted within, the court finds that Biggerstaff is qualified as an expert under Federal Rule of Evidence 702 and may offer opinion testimony at the upcoming trial in this case. Defendants motion to exclude Biggerstaffs testimony (Doc. 65) is DENIED. If defendant wishes to retain a rebuttal witness, it shall do so and shall make all disclosures related to that witness no later than May 9, 2014. If plaintiff wishes to depose defendants expert, he shall do so no later than May 23, 2014. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 4/25/14. (SAC )
February 4, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Defendants motion to strike is GRANTED as to the expert report of Robert Biggerstaff, but DENIED as to the deposition testimony of plaintiff and the affidavit testimony of Lauren Randall and Mary Honkanen. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 2/4/14. (SAC )
September 17, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Plaintiffs Motion to Compel (Doc. 19) is GRANTED, subject to the limitations described within. The scheduling order originally entered on November 5, 2012, and amended on July 10, 2013, is AMENDED as follows: Discovery SHALL BE CONCLUDED no later than October 18, 2013, at 4:30 PM. Dispositive motions SHALL BE FILED no later than November 4, 2013, at 4:30 PM. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 9/17/13. (SAC )
August 16, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER For reasons as noted within, Hunts motion to compel is held in abeyance; All deadlines are SUSPENDED. On or before August 26, 2013, 21 Mtg. shall file with the Clerk an affidavit as diected within; ON AND NOT BEFORE SEPTE MBER 6, 2013, each party shall file a brief with the Clerk, not to exceed twenty pages, justifying the partys position as outline within; 21 Mtg. shall not dispose of any equipment now in its possession without the express permission of the court. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 8/16/13. (SAC )
July 10, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 12 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Defendant; As a result of the hearing on July 8, 2018, the court hereby ORDERS as set out within; The scheduling order entered on November 5, 2012, is AMENDED to extend the discovery cutoff to August 2, 2013. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 7/10/13. (SAC )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt v. 21st Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Hunt
Represented By: Wesley L Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: R Austin Huffaker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?