Wiggins et al v. FDIC
Plaintiff: |
Robert L Wiggins, Jr and Wolf Pup, LLC |
Defendant: |
FDIC |
Case Number: |
2:2012cv02705 |
Filed: |
August 14, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama |
Office: |
Southern Office |
County: |
Jefferson |
Presiding Judge: |
Harwell G Davis |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
12 U.S.C. ยง 1821 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 12, 2021 |
Filing
328
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER- Defendants' motion for summary judgment regarding their counterclaims is DENIED (Doc. 240 ). Plaintiffs' motions for summary judgment regarding Defendants' counterclaims are GRANTED (Docs. 249 , 252 ). Defendants have no surviving counterclaim. The remaining motions for summary judgment are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART (Docs. 238 , 247 , 252 ). The parties are ORDERED to mediate this matter with the Honorable John E. Ott by no later than March 19, 2021. The parties are instructed to provide mutually agreeable mediation dates by February 17, 2021, via an email to bridget_tyree@alnd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/12/21. (MRR, )
|
June 1, 2020 |
Filing
312
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER- Frank P. Ellis IV and Character Counts, LLC's motion for summary judgment on Linda J. Peacock's claims for declaratory judgment (Doc. 236 ) is GRANTED; Peacock's motion for summary judgment on Ellis and C CLLC's claims (Doc. 242 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; and the motion for summary judgment on Ellis's counterclaim for breach of guaranty against Peacock (Doc. 240 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/1/20. (MRR, )
|
September 30, 2019 |
Filing
309
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER REGARDING CADENCE BANK'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT- The undersigned GRANTS Cadence Bank's motion for summary judgment (Doc 243 ); Accordingly, pltfs' claim for tortious interference with a protectible business relationship against Cadence is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 9/30/19. (MRR, )
|
October 10, 2017 |
Filing
210
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER REGARDING LINDA J. PEACOCK'S MOTION TO DISMISS- For the reasons stated within Linda J. Peacock's motion to dismiss (Doc 192 ) is DENIED, and Frank P. Ellis IV and Character Counts LLC's counterclaim-in-reply for fraudulent misrepresentation may proceed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/10/17. (MRR, )
|
February 14, 2017 |
Filing
180
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/14/2017. (AVC)
|
December 14, 2016 |
Filing
154
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/14/2016. (AVC)
|
February 12, 2015 |
Filing
20
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/12/2015. (AVC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?