Jones v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Company

Plaintiff: Ernesteen Jones
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Company
Case Number: 2:2013cv00624
Filed: April 4, 2013
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Referring Judge: Virginia Emerson Hopkins
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2017 196 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 2/10/2017. (JLC)
January 26, 2017 195 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 108 MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of Dr. Suzanne Parisian to the extent that it seeks to exclude Dr. Parisian's testimony in its entirety. However, Novartis' Motion is due to be GRANTED IN PA RT and DENIED IN PART as to the particular areas of Dr. Parisian's testimony that it seeks to exclude. GRANTING 112 MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of Dr. William B. Hinshaw, GRANTING 116 MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of Wayn e A. Taylor, Ph.D., GRANTING 118 MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of Non-retained Experts to the extent that either expert intends to offer an opinion on causation and is otherwise DENIED. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 1/26/2017. (JLC)
July 2, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 7/2/2013. (JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernesteen Jones
Represented By: Tammy M Smith
Represented By: Leah O Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Company
Represented By: Frederick G Helmsing, Jr
Represented By: Edward S Sledge, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?