Graveling v. Bank United N.A., et al

Defendant: Andrew P. Benefield, Ginny Rutledge, Bank United N.A., Castle Mortgage Company, Costal States Mortgage, Sirote & Permute and Ryan Daygherty
Plaintiff: Lori Graveling and James Graveling
Case Number: 2:2013mc00120
Filed: February 28, 2013
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: St. Clair
Presiding Judge: Virginia Emerson Hopkins
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2014 123 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 10/24/2014. (JLC)
October 15, 2014 115 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF OPINION. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 10/15/2014. (JLC)
August 27, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 8/27/2013. (JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graveling v. Bank United N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew P. Benefield
Represented By: Brittany A Kimbrough
Represented By: Stephen B Porterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ginny Rutledge
Represented By: Brittany A Kimbrough
Represented By: Stephen B Porterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank United N.A.
Represented By: Robert Ryan Daugherty
Represented By: Brittany A Kimbrough
Represented By: Stephen B Porterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castle Mortgage Company
Represented By: Charles D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costal States Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sirote & Permute
Represented By: Brittany A Kimbrough
Represented By: Stephen B Porterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Daygherty
Represented By: Brittany A Kimbrough
Represented By: Stephen B Porterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Graveling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Graveling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?