Branch Banking and Trust Company v. EBR Investments LLC et al

Plaintiff: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Defendant: EBR Investments LLC, Stewart Dudley and SRD Assurance Corporation
Intervenor: Davis & Norris, LLP
Case Number: 2:2014cv01578
Filed: August 13, 2014
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William M Acker
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2015 88 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND CONDITIONAL JUDGMENT Based on the foregoing and in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 69, plaintiffs motion is GRANTED and CONDITIONAL JUDGMENT is entered in favor of plaintiff and against garnishee in the amount of $3,396,177.64 plus post-judgment interest at the rate of $392.85 per day. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 9/23/15. (SAC )
May 29, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 5/29/15. (SAC )
March 16, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Defendants are ORDERED within seven days to pay plaintiff's reasonable expenses, in the amount of $825.00 to Bryan G. Hale and $3,030.03 to Mychal J. Katz. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 3/16/15. (SAC )
January 16, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 1/16/15. (SAC )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branch Banking and Trust Company v. EBR Investments LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Represented By: Bryan G Hale
Represented By: William Glenn Jensen
Represented By: Mychal Jason Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EBR Investments LLC
Represented By: John G Dana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Dudley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRD Assurance Corporation
Represented By: John G Dana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Davis & Norris, LLP
Represented By: Wesley W Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?