In re Community Health Systems Inc., MDL 2595
Plaintiff: Co-Lead Counsel and Plaintiffs' Counsel
Defendant: Community Health Systems Inc., MDL 2595, Defendants' Counsel and Lead Counsel
In Re: Local Liaison Counsel and Community Health Systems Inc
Special Master: Special Master
Case Number: 2:2015cv00222
Filed: February 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Southern Office
County: Autauga
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Referring Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 222 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/13/2019, before Judge Karon O. Bowdre. Court Reporter/Transcriber Teresa Roberson, Telephone number 205-278-2060. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 9/19/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate Page) (JLC)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER GRANTING #212 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. For the reasons stated on the record at the August 13, 2019 hearing, the Court DENIES the Objections and REJECTS the arguments of Objectors in all respects, and finds that they are unpersuasive as to the substance of their Complaints. ORDER GRANTING #215 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses and A Class Representative Incentive Award. The Court hereby retains jurisdiction over the Parties to the Settlement, including all Settlement Class members, to construe and enforce the Settlement Agreement in accordance with its terms for the mutual benefit of the Parties. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 8/22/2019. (Attachments: FILED UNDER SEAL #1 Exhibit A)(JLC)
August 13, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre: Settlement Conference held on 8/13/2019. (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson.) (FNC)
August 9, 2019 Filing 220 ***FILED UNDER SEAL*** Attachment 4. (JLC)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 219 TEXT ORDER granting #218 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 8/9/19. (MMW)
August 8, 2019 Filing 218 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by Co-Lead Counsel. (Riebel, Karen)
August 6, 2019 Filing 217 Brief re #215 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses and A Class Representative Incentive Award, #216 Notice (Other) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Declaration of Karen H. Riebel in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees, #2 Exhibit C - Declaration of Edgar C. Gentle, III, Special Master in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees)(Riebel, Karen)
August 6, 2019 Filing 216 NOTICE by Co-Lead Counsel re #215 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses and A Class Representative Incentive Award (Riebel, Karen)
August 6, 2019 Filing 215 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses and A Class Representative Incentive Award by Co-Lead Counsel. (Riebel, Karen)
August 6, 2019 Filing 214 Brief re #213 Notice (Other), #212 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Certification of Settlement Class . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Cameron Azari on Implementation of Notice, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Karen H. Riebel in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Settlement, #4 Exhibit D - Proposed Order)(Riebel, Karen)
August 6, 2019 Filing 213 NOTICE by Co-Lead Counsel re #212 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Certification of Settlement Class (Riebel, Karen)
August 6, 2019 Filing 212 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Certification of Settlement Class by Co-Lead Counsel. (Riebel, Karen)
May 23, 2019 Filing 211 Objections to Settlement by Paul Spence. (JLC)
April 29, 2019 Filing 210 Request to be Excluded from Settlement by James E. Hulsey and Teresa K. Hulsey. (JLC)
April 8, 2019 Filing 209 Objection to Settlement by Donald Shane Williams. (JLC)
February 19, 2019 Filing 208 Objection to Proposed Settlement by Donald E. Larson. (JLC)
February 19, 2019 Filing 207 Objection to Proposed Settlement by Frank Petruzzi, Administrator of the Estate of Rose M. Petruzzi. (JLC)
February 15, 2019 Filing 206 NOTICE of Exclusion from Class Action 9LDALL4C236E4DE by Cameron & Sermsiri Wylie. (JLC)
February 7, 2019 Filing 205 NOTICE of Issue With Settlement by Edward Shanler. (JLC)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 204 TEXT ORDER granting #203 Motion to Withdraw Julia A. Beasley as Attorney. Attorney Julia A. Beasley terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 12/19/18. (MMW)
December 19, 2018 Filing 203 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney - Julia A. Beasley by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Brashier, Andrew)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 12/19/2018. (KEK)
December 17, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre: Settlement Conference held on 12/17/2018. (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson.) (FNC)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 201 TEXT ORDER. The court converts the Settlement Conference set for Monday, December 17, 2018 from an in person conference to a CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE. Further, the telephone conference will BEGIN at 12:30 PM before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre. The court will provide the call-in information to the parties by email. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 12/12/2018. (FNC)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference for Monday, December 17, 2018 at 01:00 PM, CR 8, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 12/11/2018. (FNC)
December 11, 2018 Filing 199 Brief re #198 Brief, #196 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Carney, David)
December 10, 2018 Filing 198 Brief re #197 Notice (Other), #196 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval filed by Co-Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Riebel, Karen)
December 10, 2018 Filing 197 NOTICE by Co-Lead Counsel re #196 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval Hearing (Riebel, Karen)
December 10, 2018 Filing 196 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval by Co-Lead Counsel. (Riebel, Karen)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 195 TEXT ORDER: The court CONSTRUES the notice in document 194 as a motion to withdraw Kristen G. Marttila as counsel and GRANTS the motion. The court DIRECTS the Clerk to withdraw Kristen G. Marttila as counsel for Plaintiff Jeremy L. Murphy. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/17/18. (MMW)
September 13, 2018 Filing 194 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel of Withdrawal of Appearance of Kristen G. Marttila (Marttila, Kristen)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER APPROVING THE PAYMENT OF THE APRIL 2015 THROUGH FEBRUARY 2018 STATEMENT OF THE SPECIAL MASTER Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 4/24/18. (SAC )
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 6 WITH DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER AND DEADLINES TO RESPOND TO ORDERS TO SHOW CAUSE: The court GRANTS #191 Joint Request to Extend Deadlines in Discovery Schedule and SETS the following deadlines for limited discovery and for responses to the court's Orders to Show Cause and AMENDS Case Management Order No. 5's Scheduling Order (doc. 189) to add these deadlines: Deadline for Response to Order to Show Cause (doc. 186) March 26, 2018; Deadline for the Completion of all Depositions March 30, 2018; Deadline for Response to Order to Show Cause (doc. 187) April 16, 2018; Deadline for Filing Dispositive Motions on the Limited Scope Issues May 1, 2018. The suspension of all other unexpired deadlines ordered on June 30, 2016 (doc. 143) remains in effect for all applicable deadlines except those listed within until the court enters another case management order with further scheduling. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 1/5/18. (SAC )
January 3, 2018 Filing 191 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Co-Lead Counsel. (Riebel, Karen)
December 1, 2017 Filing 190 STATUS REPORT [JOINT] by Co-Lead Counsel. filed by Co-Lead Counsel (Riebel, Karen)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 189 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 5 WITH DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER AND DEADLINES TO RESPOND TO ORDERS TO SHOW CAUSE: re #188 Request to Extend Deadlines in Discovery Schedule; The court GRANTS the motion; SETS the deadlines for limited discovery and for responses to the court's Orders to Show Cause and AMENDS Case Management Order No. 4's Scheduling Order #181 as set out within. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 11/6/17. (SAC )
November 3, 2017 Filing 188 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Co-Lead Counsel. (Riebel, Karen)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS The individuals noted within are Named Plaintiffs in the underlying suits transferred to this court as part of the MDL but were not named in the MDL's Consolidated Amended Complaint. The court ORDERS the following Plaintiffs to SHOW CAUSE in writing by November 30, 2017, why the court should not dismiss these plaintiffs in the underlying suits for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, applying the same rationale set forth in the rulings above that the court applied to the Named Plaintiffs in the MDL's Consolidated Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/10/17. (SAC )
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS- The court ORDERS the Plaintiffs to SHOW CAUSE in writing by November 10, 2017, why the court should not dismiss for lack of standing the Plaintiffs listed within and their claims from the underlying cases transferred to this MDL. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/10/17. (SAC )
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER re #184 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel #184 - The court DIRECTS the Clerk of the Court to reflect on the docket sheet that the Plaintiffs have withdrawn their motion to compel and that this withdrawal is without prejudice to its re-filing after the targeted discovery referenced in Case Management No. 4 is completed. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 8/15/17. (SAC )
August 11, 2017 Filing 184 NOTICE by Co-Lead Counsel re #132 MOTION to Compel Production of Customer List Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel (Riebel, Karen)
July 7, 2017 Filing 183 Community Health Systems, Inc's ANSWER to #53 Amended Complaint, #130 Amended Complaint , ANSWER to #53 Amended Complaint, #130 Amended Complaint by Community Health Systems Inc.(Jacobson, John)
July 7, 2017 Filing 182 PSC's ANSWER to #53 Amended Complaint, #130 Amended Complaint , ANSWER to #53 Amended Complaint, #130 Amended Complaint by Lead Counsel.(Warren, Daniel)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 4 WITH DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER- The court SETS the following deadlines for limited discovery and AMENDS Case Management Order No. 3's Scheduling Order to add deadlines as setout within. The court SETS July 7, 2017 as the deadline for Defendants to answer the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. The court's suspension of all other unexpired deadlines remains in effect for all deadlines except those listed above until the court enters another case management order with further scheduling. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 6/14/17. (SAC )
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER re #168 Plaintiffs' Amended Renewed Motion for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal- For the reasons discussed at the status conference today, the court DENIES this motion. The court further ORDERS the parties to provide to the court via email (bowdre_chambers@alnd.uscourts.gov) on or before June 1, 2017 a joint proposed schedule for discovery of the limited scope discussed at the conference. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 5/19/17. (SAC )
May 18, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre: Status Conference held on 5/18/2017. (Court Reporter Christina Decker.) (FNC)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting #176 and #177 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney- Attorney Joshua Patrick Hayes and Robert F Prince terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 5/2/17. (SAC )
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE The court SETS a Status Conference in this case for Thursday, May 18, 2017 at 1:00 PM in the 8th floor courtroom at the Hugo L. Black United States Courthouse in Birmingham, Alabama. The parties should be prepared to discuss informally "Plaintiffs' Amended Renewed Motion for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal", which is under submission. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 4/24/17. (SAC )
April 21, 2017 Filing 177 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Prince, Robert)
April 21, 2017 Filing 176 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Hayes, Joshua)
April 21, 2017 Filing 175 REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiff Co-Lead Counsel re: #168 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appeal [Renewed] filed by Co-Lead Counsel. (Riebel, Karen)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 TEXT ORDER granting #173 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Allow the Filing of Consolidated Briefs as to Both Defendants." Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 4-19-17. (AMW, )
April 19, 2017 Filing 173 MOTION to Allow the Filing of Consolidated Briefs as to Both Defendants by Co-Lead Counsel. (Riebel, Karen)
April 7, 2017 Filing 172 Opposition to re #168 to Plaintiffs' Amended Renewed Motion for Interlocutory Appeal filed by Community Health Systems Inc. (Taber, William)
April 7, 2017 Filing 171 RESPONSE in Opposition re #168 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appeal [Renewed] filed by Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Ben Fordham, #2 Exhibit B - Management Agreement)(Warren, Daniel)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re #168 Plaintiffs' Amended Renewed Motion for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal- Defendants' response to the motion will be due on or before April 7, 2017. Any reply brief, if necessary, will be due on or before April 21, 2017. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 3/16/17. (SAC )
March 15, 2017 Filing 169 Brief re #168 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appeal [Renewed] filed by Co-Lead Counsel. (Riebel, Karen)
March 15, 2017 Filing 168 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appeal [Renewed] by Co-Lead Counsel. (Riebel, Karen)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER re #154 Renewed Motion for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal- For the reasons stated in the Memorandum Opinion, filed contemporaneously with this Order, the court DENIES the motion; however, the court will allow the Plaintiffs leave to submit on or before March 15, 2017 a motion for certification for interlocutory appeal that re-phrases questions number one and two. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/15/17. (SAC )
February 15, 2017 Filing 166 MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/15/17. (SAC )
November 29, 2016 Filing 165 REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiff Co-Lead Counsel re: #154 MOTION for Leave to Appeal [Renewed] filed by Co-Lead Counsel. (Riebel, Karen)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 164 TEXT ORDER granting #163 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Allow the Filing of Consolidated Briefs as to Both Defendants. As stated in the motion, the consolidated reply brief to documents 160 and 161 should be 15 pages or less. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 11/28/16. (MMW)
November 23, 2016 Filing 163 MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Reply Brief (Unopposed) by Co-Lead Counsel. (Riebel, Karen)
November 15, 2016 Filing 162 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Co-Lead Counsel. (Riebel, Karen)
November 11, 2016 Filing 161 Opposition to re #154 To Plaintiff's Motion for Interlocutory Appeal filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Jacobson, John)
November 11, 2016 Filing 160 RESPONSE in Opposition re #154 MOTION for Leave to Appeal [Renewed] filed by Lead Counsel. (Warren, Daniel)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re #154 Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal, which is opposed. The Defendants' response will be due November 11, 2016. Any reply brief, if necessary, will be due November 29, 2016. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/21/16. (SAC )
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting Community Health Systems Professional Services Corporation's #153 Motion to Postpone Answer Deadline Pending Plaintiffs' Motion for Interlocutory Appeal. The court SUSPENDS the deadline to answer. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10-21-16. (AMW, )
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 157 TEXT ORDER granting CHSI's #156 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. The court SUSPENDS the deadline for answering at this time. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10-21-16. (AMW, )
October 20, 2016 Filing 156 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by Defendants' Counsel. (Taber, William)
October 20, 2016 Filing 155 Brief re #154 MOTION for Leave to Appeal [Renewed] filed by Co-Lead Counsel. (Riebel, Karen)
October 20, 2016 Filing 154 MOTION for Leave to Appeal [Renewed] by Co-Lead Counsel. (Riebel, Karen)
October 20, 2016 Filing 153 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Pending Plaintiffs' Forthcoming Motion for Interlocutory Appeal by Defendants' Counsel. (Warren, Daniel)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER re #132 Motion to Compel- The court REFERS this discovery matter to Magistrate Judge John England; Case Management Order No. 3, II.B. states: Discovery disputes generally will be referred to a magistrate judge for handling (Doc. 23, at 3), and Judge England is the Magistrate Judge assisting the undersigned in this MDL. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/4/16. (SAC )
September 27, 2016 Filing 151 STATUS REPORT by Community Health Systems Inc, Defendants' Counsel, Lead Counsel, Local Liaison Counsel, Special Master. filed by Community Health Systems Inc, Defendants' Counsel, Lead Counsel, Local Liaison Counsel, Special Master (Smith, Richard)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 150 TEXT ORDER granting unopposed #148 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. The new deadline to file the Answer is October 26, 2016. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9-23-16. (AMW, )
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 149 TEXT ORDER granting unopposed #147 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. The new deadline to file an Answer is October 26, 2016. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9-23-16. (AMW, )
September 22, 2016 Filing 148 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Lead Counsel. (Taber, William)
September 22, 2016 Filing 147 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Lead Counsel. (Warren, Daniel)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER re #132 Motion to Compel- The court ORDERS counsel to confer in good faith about the dispute, and to file a joint status report on or before September 27, 2016 as to the results of their efforts. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/13/16. (SAC )
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS- re #67 Community Health Systems, Inc. [CHSI]'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and Failure to State a Claim and #69 Motion to Dismiss filed by Community Health Systems Professional Services Corporation [PSC]. These motions were directed at the #53 Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint; this Order only addresses the claims in the Consolidated Amended Complaint and its Named Plaintiffs. The court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART both motions, as further set out in the Order. The court DISMISSES all claims in Count VI (Bailment); Count VII (Willful Violation of the FCRA); and Count VIII (Negligent Violation of the FCRA)of the Consolidated Amended Complaint, and also dismisses some claims set out in other counts, as further set out in the Order. This case will proceed with certain remaining state law claims asserted against Defendant PSC by Named Plaintiffs Kathy Ellzey, Lynda Matus, Dallas Richard, Ashley Veciana, Melissa Cooper, Johannes Nhete, John Sanchez, William Lutz, Christopher Brown, and Tara June Moore, as specified within. This case will proceed with certain remaining state law claims asserted against Defendant CHSI by Named Plaintiffs Kathy Ellzey, Lynda Matus, Dallas Richard, Ashley Veciana, Melissa Cooper, John Sanchez, William Lutz, and Tara June Moore, as specified within. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/12/16. (SAC )
September 12, 2016 Filing 144 MEMORANDUM OPINION ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/12/16. (SAC )
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 143 TEXT ORDER: In response to the request in the recent Joint Status Report (doc. 142) for modification of certain deadlines, the court SUSPENDS all unexpired deadlines except the November 15, 2016 deadline for filing a joint status report. After the court enters an order on the pending motions to dismiss, the court will set a status/scheduling conference to determine new deadlines and will enter a new scheduling order. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 6-30-16. (AMW, )
June 22, 2016 Filing 142 STATUS REPORT filed Jointly by Co-Lead Counsel. filed by Co-Lead Counsel (Riebel, Karen)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER re "NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal", (doc. 15) filed in one of the cases consolidated in this MDL, Veciana v. Community Health Sys., Inc, Case No., 2:15-CV-279-KOB. To protect the integrity of the MDL process, the court FINDS that any request for dismissal of any underlying suit SHALL be brought pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) and accomplished by court order. The court STRIKES the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as inappropriate and DIRECTS the Plaintiffs to file any request for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a) (2). Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 6/21/16. (SAC ) Modified on 6/21/2016 (SAC ).
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 TEXT ORDER granting [doc. 139] Joint Request to Extend Deadline for Status Report; the court MODIFIES CMO No 3 [doc. 23] to EXTEND the deadline for filing a joint status report from June 15, 2016 to June 22, 2016. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 6-16-2016. (AMW, )
June 15, 2016 Filing 139 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by Co-Lead Counsel. (Riebel, Karen)
June 10, 2016 Filing 138 RESPONSE in Opposition re #132 MOTION to Compel Production of Customer List filed by Community Health Systems Inc. (Jacobson, John)
June 10, 2016 Filing 137 RESPONSE in Opposition re #132 MOTION to Compel Production of Customer List filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transcript of February 10, 2016 Hearing, #2 Exhibit B - Transcript of April 15, 2016 Conference, #3 Exhibit C - Sample Solicitation by Plaintiffs' Counsel)(Warren, Daniel)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 TEXT ORDER granting #134 Motion for Extension of Time; the new deadline for Defendant CHSI to respond to Plaintiffs' motion to compel is Friday, June 10, 2016. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 6-8-16. (AMW, )
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting #133 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel; the new deadline for Defendant PSC to respond is Friday, June 10, 2016. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 6-8-16. (AMW, )
June 7, 2016 Filing 134 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by Defendants' Counsel. (Taber, William)
June 7, 2016 Filing 133 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #132 MOTION to Compel Production of Customer List by Community Health Systems Inc. (Smith, Richard)
June 1, 2016 Filing 132 *** WITHDRAWN (per #185 Order) *** MOTION to Compel Production of Customer List by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Friedman, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/15/2017 (SAC ).
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER re #118 Motion for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal and #128 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal- Based on the notice of withdrawal, the court FINDS that the motion for certification is withdrawn, and the court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to terminate that motion. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 5/13/16. (SAC )
April 29, 2016 Filing 130 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' Supplement to the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Co-Lead Counsel.(Riebel, Karen)
April 29, 2016 Filing 129 Brief Regarding Standing for State Statutory Claims. (Riebel, Karen)
April 29, 2016 Filing 128 NOTICE by Co-Lead Counsel re #118 MOTION for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal (Riebel, Karen)
April 26, 2016 Filing 127 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 15, 2016, before Judge Bowdre. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 5/17/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/27/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Certificate page) (SAC )
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER-During the April 15, 2016 conference, counsel for the Plaintiffs acknowledged and agreed that the July 20, 2015 "Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint" #53 remains the operative complaint for the MDL; that this court's rulings regarding that operative Complaint remain in effect and apply to the new case; and that the transfer to the MDL of the new McNutt case brings neither new claims, new Plaintiffs, nor new factual allegations to the operative Complaint, and does not affect those previous rulings. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on /18/2016. (AVC)
April 15, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre: Motion Hearing held on 4/15/2016. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson.) (FNC)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 PARTIAL ORDER ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS SUBSTITUTED FOR DOCUMENT 95: This court FINDS that it has personal jurisdiction over Community Health Systems, Inc. ("CHSI") for the claims asserted by the Plaintiffs in the two cases transferred from a district court sitting in Tennessee: Ellzey v. Community Health Systems, Inc., Case No. 2:15-CV-1640 and Murphy v. Community Health Systems, Inc., Case No: 2:15-CV-281. The court GRANTS for lack of personal jurisdiction CHSI's motion to dismiss to the extent that it requests dismissal of claims asserted against it in cases other than Ellzey and Murphy; the court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE all claims asserted against CHSI in cases other than Ellzey and Murphy. The court GRANTS PSC's motion to dismiss (doc. 69) as to the non-statutory claims of all Named Plaintiffs other than Lynda Matus, Dallas Richard, Ashley Veciana, Melissa Cooper, Johannes Nhete, John Sanchez, Christopher Brown, and Tara June Moore; the court DISMISSES those claims WITHOUT PREJUDICE. However, the court grants PSC's motion against Kathy Ellzey provisionally; the court will allow Ms. Ellzey to re-plead. The court also grants PSC's motion against William Lutz provisionally; the court will allow Mr. Lutz to re-plead. The parties have agreed to postpone repleading until after all of the court's rulings on the motions to dismiss. The court DENIES PSC's motion to dismiss to the extent that it challenges the Article III case or controversy standing of Lynda Matus, Dallas Richard, Ashley Veciana, Melissa Cooper, Johannes Nhete, John Sanchez, Christopher Brown, and Tara June Moore. Although CHSI did not present a facial challenge to standing, the court FINDS that the same standing requirement applies to claims against CHSI, so the court sua sponte DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE the same non-statutory claims asserted against CHSI to the extent they are brought in Tennessee, which are the only claims brought in a jurisdiction with personal jurisdiction over CHSI. The court DENIES CHSI's motion to dismiss to the extent that it asserts a factual attack on standing. In sum, the court has jurisdiction over the non-statutory claims asserted against PSC by the following Named Plaintiffs: Lynda Matus, Dallas Richard, Ashley Veciana, Melissa Cooper, Johannes Nhete, John Sanchez, Christopher Brown, and Tara June Moore. The court has jurisdiction over the non-statutory claims brought originally in Tennessee and asserted against CHSI by the following Named Plaintiffs: Lynda Matus, John Sanchez, Tara June Moore. As the court has not yet addressed statutory standing, all statutory claims asserted against PSC remain at this point, and the statutory claims asserted against CHSI and brought in Tennessee by all Plaintiffs in the Ellzey and Murphy cases remain at this point. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 4/14/16. (MMW)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER WITHDRAWING ORDER OF FEBRUARY 17, 2017 (DOC. 95) AND SUBSTITUTING NEW ORDER filed simultaneously with this Order for the reasons set out more fully within. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 4/14/16. (MMW)
April 14, 2016 Filing 123 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO -7) from the Judicial Panel on MDL 2595 transferring 1 action listed on schedule to the Northern District of Alabama; 2:16-cv-602-KOB from TNM. (SAC )
April 8, 2016 Filing 122 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel Regarding McNutt Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint)(Warren, Daniel)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 TEXT ORDER: The court DEFERS RULING on "Motion for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal" (doc. 118) until after the court rules on the pending motions to dismiss. The Defendants will have an opportunity in the future to respond to the motion, if desired. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 4-5-16. (AMW, )
April 1, 2016 Filing 120 NOTICE of Discovery Dispute by Co-Lead Counsel, Plaintiffs' Counsel (Friedman, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2016 Filing 119 Brief in Support of #118 MOTION for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal. (Riebel, Karen)
March 31, 2016 Filing 118 *** WITHDRAWN per notice of withdrawal (doc. 128) and court's Order (doc. 131) *** MOTION for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal by Co-Lead Counsel. (Riebel, Karen) Modified on 5/13/2016 (SAC ).
March 29, 2016 Filing 117 SUR-REPLY to Address New Case Law filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Warren, Daniel)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER re #114 Motion for Leave to File- The court GRANTS PSC's motion and reminds PSC to FILE the sur-reply on or before April 4, 2016. The court DENIES the Plaintiffs' request (doc. 115) to file a sur-reply. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 3/28/16. (SAC )
March 25, 2016 Filing 115 Opposition to re #114 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply Instanter filed by Co-Lead Counsel. (Riebel, Karen)
March 24, 2016 Filing 114 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Address New Case Law by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Sur-Reply to Address New Case Law)(Warren, Daniel)
March 18, 2016 Filing 113 REPLY to re #101 Standing Under the Fair Credit Reporting Act filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Warren, Daniel)
March 18, 2016 Filing 112 REPLY to re #99 to Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law Regarding Standing Under the Fair Credit Reporting Act filed by Community Health Systems Inc. (Jacobson, John)
March 18, 2016 Filing 111 RESPONSE to re #103 , #100 Defendants' Supplemental Briefing on Choice-of-Law Issues filed by Co-Lead Counsel. (Riebel, Karen)
March 18, 2016 Filing 110 REPLY to re #102 , #100 Defendants' Supplemental Briefing on FCRA Standing filed by Co-Lead Counsel. (Riebel, Karen)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 TEXT ORDER granting #108 "Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Allow the Filing of Consolidated Briefs as to Both Defendants"; as requested, Plaintiffs may file one consolidated brief of twenty pages or less as to the Fair Credit Reporting Act issues and may file one consolidated brief of 30 pages as to the State Choice of Law issues. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 3-17-16. (AMW, )
March 17, 2016 Filing 108 First MOTION To file consolidated briefs as to both Defendants by Co-Lead Counsel. (Friedman, Jeffrey)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 TEXT ORDER granting #105 "Substitute Joint Motion to Alter Case Management Order No. 3." The court EXTENDS the deadline for the filing of the Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification to a date to be determined by the court in the future. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 3-16-16. (AMW, )
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #104 "Joint Motion to Alter Case Management Order No. 3" in light of the filing of #105 "Substitute Joint Motion to Alter Case Management Order No. 3." Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 3-16-16. (AMW, )
March 16, 2016 Filing 105 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification by Co-Lead Counsel. (Friedman, Jeffrey)
March 15, 2016 Filing 104 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification by Co-Lead Counsel. (Friedman, Jeffrey)
March 4, 2016 Filing 103 Brief re #96 Order,,, PSC's Choice of Law Brief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PSC Choice of Law Chart)(Warren, Daniel)
March 4, 2016 Filing 102 Brief re #96 Order,,, PSC's Brief Regarding Plaintiffs' Standing Under the Fair Credit Reporting Act. (Warren, Daniel)
March 4, 2016 Filing 101 RESPONSE to re #96 Court's Request for Supplemental Briefing on FCRA Standing filed by Co-Lead Counsel. (Riebel, Karen)
March 4, 2016 Filing 100 Brief re #67 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and Failure to State a Claim Community Health Systems, Inc.'s Supplemental Brief In Support Of Its Motion To Dismiss. (Jacobson, John)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #98 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Briefs Regarding Plaintiffs' Standing under the Fair Credit Reporting Act and Choice of Law Issues as set out within. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/29/16. (SAC )
February 26, 2016 Filing 98 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefs Regarding Plaintiffs' Standing Under the Fair Credit Reporting Act and Choice of Law Issues by Community Health Systems Inc. (Smith, Richard)
February 24, 2016 Filing 97 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 10, 2016, before Judge Bowdre. Court Reporter/Transcriber Teresa Roberson. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 3/16/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/24/2016. (Attachments: #1 Certification Page) (SAC, )
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER re #67 Motion to Dismiss by Community Health Systems, Inc. and #69 Motion to Dismiss by Community Health Systems Professional Services Corporation. As discussed at the hearing held on February 10, 2016, the court ORDERS the following additional briefing: 1. The parties shall simultaneously file briefs on or before Wednesday, March 2, 2016 addressing whether the Plaintiffs have statutory standing in this federal court for the claims asserted in Counts VII and VIII for violations of the FCRA. The parties shall file a reply to the opposing brief on or before Wednesday, March 16, 2016. 2. Defendants shall file a supplemental brief, in support of their motions to dismiss on the Rule 12(b)(6) challenges, or before Wednesday, March 2, 2016 addressing the issues as setout within this order. Plaintiffs shall respond to the Defendants' supplemental brief on or before Wednesday, March 16, 2016. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/17/16. (SAC )
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ***WITHDRAWN and SUBSTITUTED per #125 ORDER*** ORDER This court FINDS that it has personal jurisdiction over Community Health Systems, Inc. ("CHSI") for the claims asserted by the Plaintiffs in the two cases transferred from a district court sitting in Tennessee: Ellzey v. Community Health Systems, Inc., Case No. 2:15-CV-1640 and Murphy v. Community Health Systems, Inc., Case No: 2:15-CV-281. The court GRANTS for lack of personal jurisdiction CHSI's motion to dismiss to the extent that it requests dismissal of claims asserted against it in cases other than Ellzey and Murphy; the court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE all claims asserted against CHSI in cases other than Ellzey and Murphy. The court GRANTS PSC's motion to dismiss (doc. 69) as to the common law claims of all other Named Plaintiffs not listed in paragraph 1 of page 4 of this order. The court DENIES PSC's motion to dismiss to the extent that it challenges the Article III standing of Lynda Matus, Dallas Richard, Ashley Veciana, Melissa Cooper, Johannes Nhete, John Sanchez, Christopher Brown, and Tara June Moore. The court GRANTS PSC's motion to dismiss as to the following Plaintiffs because they do not allege an injury-in-fact that is fairly traceable to the Defendants' alleged wrongful conduct, and thus, do not have Article III standing: Kathy Ellzey (provisional granting), Daniel Watson, Joel Lovelace, Joan Crespin, William Lutz (provisional granting), and Cynthia Ann Martin Stonestreet, as Executor of the Estate of Mary Glah. The court grants PSC's motion against Kathy Ellzey provisionally; the court will allow Ms. Ellzey to re-plead. The court also grants PSC's motion against William Lutz provisionally; the court will allow Mr. Lutz to re-plead. The court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE the common law claims of those Plaintiffs against PSC. Although CHSI did not present a facial challenge to standing, the court FINDS that the same standing requirement applies to claims against CHSI, so the court sua sponte DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE the same claims asserted against CHSI to the extent they are brought in Tennessee, which are the only claims brought in a jurisdiction with personal jurisdiction over CHSI. The court DENIES CHSI's motion to dismiss to the extent that it asserts a factual attack on standing. In sum, the court has jurisdiction over the common law claims asserted against PSC by the following Named Plaintiffs: Lynda Matus, Dallas Richard, Ashley Veciana, Melissa Cooper, Johannes Nhete, John Sanchez, Christopher Brown, and Tara June Moore. The court has jurisdiction over the common law claims brought originally in Tennessee and asserted against CHSI by the following Named Plaintiffs: Lynda Matus, John Sanchez, Tara June Moore. The court notes that it has dismissed the claims of Kathy Ellzey and William Lutz provisionally, and will allow them to re-plead at a later date. The parties have agreed to postpone repleading until after all of the court's rulings on the motions to dismiss. As the court has not yet addressed statutory standing, all statutory claims asserted against PSC remain at this point, and the statutory claims asserted against CHSI and brought in Tennessee in the Ellzey and Murphy cases remain at this point. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/17/16. (SAC ) Modified on 4/15/2016 (SAC, ).
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER SETTING HEARING The court CONVERTS the status conference SET on Friday, April 15, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. into a continuation of the HEARING on the motions referenced within, to be held in the eighth floor courtroom in the Hugo L. Black United States Courthouse in Birmingham, Alabama. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/17/16. (SAC )
February 10, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre: Motion Hearing held on 2/10/2016 re #67 and #69 . Discussions regarding motions as stated on the record. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson.) (FNC)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER This court recently received the parties "Joint Status Report." (Doc. 90). The court SETS a Status Conference in this matter for Friday, April 15, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. in the 8th floor courtroom at the Hugo L. Black United States Courthouse in Birmingham, Alabama, and will set the agenda for the status conference by separate order. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 1/22/16. (SAC )
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER SETTING HEARING The court SETS a hearing re #67 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and Failure to State a Claim and #69 Motion to Dismiss, for Wednesday, February 10, 2016, beginning at 9:30 a.m. in the 8th floor courtroom at the Hugo L. Black United States Courthouse in Birmingham, Alabama. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 1/22/16. (SAC )
January 22, 2016 Filing 92 ***Document Sealed - Co-Lead Counsel's Notice of Filing Exhibits Under Seal. (filed under seal per doc. 81/TEXT ORDER granting #79 Motion to File Under Seal) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (SAC )
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 TEXT ORDER granting #89 "Defendants' Unopposed Motion Requesting Oral Arguments on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss." By separate order, the court will set a date for a hearing or hearings. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 1-19-16. (AMW, )
January 15, 2016 Filing 90 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Defendants' Counsel. filed by Defendants' Counsel (Smith, Richard)
January 14, 2016 Filing 89 MOTION Requesting Oral Arguments on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Defendants' Counsel. (Smith, Richard)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #87 Unopposed Motion to Substitute Proper Party- The court GRANTS the motion, and SUBSTITUTES Plaintiff Cynthia Ann Martin Stonestreet, as Executor of the Estate of Mary Martin Glah, for Plaintiff Mary Martin Glah. The court DIRECTS the Clerk of the Court to enter this Order and reflect this substitution on the docket sheet not only in the master file but also in the member case that Ms. Glah filed, Glah v. Community Health Systems, Inc., Case No. 2:15-CV-227-KOB. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 12/3/15. (SAC )
December 2, 2015 Filing 87 MOTION to Substitute Party by Co-Lead Counsel, Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Friedman, Jeffrey)
November 30, 2015 Filing 86 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO -6) from the Judicial Panel on MDL 2595 transferring 1 action listed on schedule A to the Northern District of Alabama; 2:15-cv-1883-KOB from PAW. (Filed in USDC, NDAL Oct. 26, 2015) (SAC )
November 30, 2015 Filing 85 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO -4); from the Judicial Panel on MDL 2595 transferring 2 actions listed on schedule A to the Northern District of Alabama; 2:15-cv-1639-KOB from INN & 2:15-cv-1640-KOB from TNM. (Filed Sept. 18, 2015 in USDC, NDAL).(SAC)
November 24, 2015 Filing 84 ***Notification of Informational Order from MDL Panel re CTO 5 as to One Opposed Case Vacating Transfer Order*** ORDER VACATING CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER AND VACATING THE DECEMBER 3, 2015, HEARING SESSION ORDER- For the reasons noted within, it is ORDERED that the Panel's conditional transfer order designated as "CTO-5" filed on September 2, 2015, is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Hearing Session Order and the attached Schedule filed on October 21, 2015, are VACATED insofar as they relate to this matter. (SAC ) Modified on 12/2/2015 (SAC ).
November 13, 2015 Filing 83 REPLY Brief filed by In Re Community Health Systems Inc re: #67 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and Failure to State a Claim filed by Community Health Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hamilton v. Gateway)(Taber, William)
October 30, 2015 Filing 82 REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Defendants' Counsel re: #73 Response in Opposition to Motion, #69 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing under Rule 12(b)(1) and for Failure to State a Claim under Rule 12(b)(6), #70 Brief, filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Warren, Daniel)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 TEXT ORDER granting #79 "Co-Lead Counsel's Motion for Leave to File Documents under Seal." Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10-30-15. (AMW, )
October 27, 2015 Filing 80 RESPONSE in Opposition re #67 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and Failure to State a Claim filed by Co-Lead Counsel, Local Liaison Counsel, Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Friedman, Jeffrey)
October 27, 2015 Filing 79 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by Co-Lead Counsel, Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Friedman, Jeffrey)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting Defendant CHSPSC's #77 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief; granting #77 Motion for Permission to File Reply Brief with up to Five Additional Pages. These motions were filed with the consent of all parties. The Reply brief with a page limit of 15 pages will now be due on or before October 30, 2015. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10-26-15. (AMW, )
October 24, 2015 Filing 77 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #73 Response in Opposition to Motion, , Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendants' Counsel. (Hooks, Jonathan)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 TEXT ORDER: The court DEEMS the "Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel" filed by Matthew J. Zuchetto to be a motion to withdraw, and the court GRANTS that motion. Darrell W. Scott of The Scott Law Group, P.S. will continue to represent Plaintiffs Edward Adams and Melissa Harms. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10-22-15. (AMW, )
October 21, 2015 Filing 75 NOTICE by Local Liaison Counsel of Withdrawal as Counsel (Zuchetto, Matthew)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 TEXT ORDER. Pursuant to the information contained in the joint status report provided to the court on October 15, 2015, the court CANCELS the status conference set for Friday, October 23, 2015 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/16/2015. (FNC)
October 13, 2015 Filing 73 RESPONSE in Opposition re #69 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing under Rule 12(b)(1) and for Failure to State a Claim under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Co-Lead Counsel, Local Liaison Counsel, Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Smith v. Triad of Alabama, LLC, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Bank of Nashville v. Chipman, #3 Exhibit Ex C - Unjust Enrichment Survey)(Friedman, Jeffrey)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE on #67 Community Health Systems, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and Failure to State a Claim. The Plaintiffs' response will be due on October 27, 2015. Any reply, if necessary, will be due November 13, 2015. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/22/15. (MMW)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE on #69 Defendant Community Health Systems Professional Services Corporation n/k/a CHSPSC, LLC's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' response will be due October 13, 2015. Any reply brief, if necessary, will be due October 27, 2015. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/22/15. (MMW)
September 21, 2015 Filing 70 Brief re #69 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing under Rule 12(b)(1) and for Failure to State a Claim under Rule 12(b)(6) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts of Community Health Systems, Inc.'s 2014 SEC Form 10k)(Warren, Daniel)
September 21, 2015 Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing under Rule 12(b)(1) and for Failure to State a Claim under Rule 12(b)(6) by Defendants' Counsel. (Warren, Daniel)
September 21, 2015 Filing 68 Brief re #67 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fordham Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - Ex 1 - Excerpts from www.chs.net, #3 Exhibit A - Ex 2 - Excerpts from CHSI 10-K, #4 Exhibit B - City of Irondale Case, #5 Exhibit C - Weisler Case, #6 Exhibit D - Ellsworth Case, #7 Exhibit E - Cummings Case, #8 Exhibit F - Stewart Case, #9 Exhibit G - Additional cases dismissing CHSI)(Jacobson, John)
September 21, 2015 Filing 67 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and Failure to State a Claim by Community Health Systems Inc. (Jacobson, John)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 TEXT ORDER granting Community Health Systems Professional Services Corporation's #65 Motion for Leave to File Thirty-five Page Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, filed with the consent of the Plaintiffs' Counsel. The response brief shall have a corresponding limit of thirty-five pages. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9-18-15. (AMW, )
September 16, 2015 Filing 65 MOTION for Leave to File Thirty-Five page Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Defendants' Counsel. (Smith, Richard)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 TEXT ORDER granting #63 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint; the new deadline to answer or otherwise respond is September 21, 2015. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 8-20-15. (AMW, )
August 19, 2015 Filing 63 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Smith, Richard)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER REGARDING PROTOCOLS FOR PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL TIME AND EXPENSE SUBMISSIONS The court ORDERS that any Plaintiffs' Counsel seeking fees and/or expense reimbursement SHALL use the standards and protocols as set out within. The court notes that it has appointed Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel and Co-Lead Counsel to assist Special Master Ed Gentle (Special Master) in the administration of the protocols set forth in this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 8/3/15. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C, #4 Attachment D, #5 Attachment E)(SAC, )
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 TEXT ORDER granting #56 "Motion Requesting Entry of Order on Protocols for Plaintiff Counsel's Time and Expense Submissions" to the extent that it requests such an Order but noting that the court has made wordsmithing changes to the proposed order attached to the motion. The court will enter separately the Order Regarding Protocols for Plaintiffs' Counsel Time and Expense Submissions. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 8-3-15. (AMW, )
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 TEXT ORDER: The court construes the Notice of Withdrawal of Jeremy Lloyd Carlson as Counsel for Community Health Systems Professional Services Corporation n/k/a CHSPSC, LLC (doc. 58) as a motion to withdraw and GRANTS the motion. Attorney Jeremy Lloyd Carlson terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 8/3/15. (MMW)
July 31, 2015 Filing 59 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel for CHSPSC, LLC of Service of Requests for Production and Interrogatories (Ghannoum, Lisa)
July 31, 2015 Filing 58 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney - Notice of Withdrawal by Community Health Systems Inc. (Carlson, Jeremy)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER re #55 CHSPSC's Notice Regarding Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended class Action Complaint: The court will not strike sua sponte Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint for failure to obtain leave of court to file that document. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 7/28/15. (SAC )
July 27, 2015 Filing 56 MOTION Requesting Entry of Order on Protocols for Plaintiff Counsel's Time and Expense Submissions by Co-Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A")(Friedman, Jeffrey)
July 23, 2015 Filing 55 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel CHSPSC's Notice Regarding Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint (Smith, Richard)
July 22, 2015 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Co-Lead Counsel re #53 Amended Complaint (Riebel, Karen)
July 20, 2015 Filing 53 CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Co-Lead Counsel.(Riebel, Karen)
July 15, 2015 Filing 52 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel for CHSPSC, LLC of Service of Initial Disclosures (Ghannoum, Lisa)
July 15, 2015 Filing 51 NOTICE by Community Health Systems Inc of Service of Initial Disclosures (Shuford, Wynn)
July 15, 2015 Filing 50 NOTICE by Co-Lead Counsel, Plaintiffs' Counsel of Service of Initial Disclosures (Friedman, Jeffrey)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER-re: Motion for More Definite Statement (doc. 40); Motion to Dismiss (doc. 41); Motion for a More Definite Statement under Rule 12(e) and to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(1) (doc. 42); Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement (doc. 44); and Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint to Add Additional Party Plaintiffs (doc. 54) filed in case (2:14-cv-1620-KOB) Alverson v. Community Health Systems, Inc.,. The court FINDS the Dfts' motions currently pending in Alverson (docs. 40,41,42&44)to be MOOT. The court DEFERS ruling at this time on the Pltfs' motion to amend, pending a determination regarding an appropriate procedural mechanism for inclusion of Plaintiffs named in the Consolidated Class Action Complaint but not named in any underlying cases consolidated in the MDL. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 7/15/2015. (AVC)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER -The court LIFTS the STAY previously entered. Counsel SHALL confer by 7/28/2015 and email to the court a joint proposal addressing the issue of the appropriate procedural mechanism for inclusion of Pltfs named in the Consolidated Class Action Complaint but not currently named in any underlying case consolidated in this MDL. The court SETS the next Status Conference in this matter for 10/23/2015 at 9:30a.m. A Joint Status Report shall be filed by 10/15/2015. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 7/15/2015. (AVC)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER-The court hereby APPOINTS Edgar C. Gentle, III, to serve as a Special Master in this action. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 7/15/2015. (AVC)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 "Motion for Appointment of Edgar C. Gentle as Special Master" to this extent: by separate order, the court will enter the proposed order attached to the motion with changes that are not substantive. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 7-15-15. (AMW, )
July 14, 2015 Filing 45 MOTION for Appointment of Edgar C. Gentle as Special Master by Co-Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Friedman, Jeffrey)
July 14, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre: Status Conference held on 7/14/2015. (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson.) (FNC)
July 13, 2015 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard E Smith on behalf of Defendants' Counsel (Smith, Richard)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 FRE 502(D) AND (E) CLAWBACK STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding protected materials as set out within. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 7/10/15. (SAC )
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 7/10/15. (SAC )
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re #32 Joint Motion for Approval of Electronic Discovery Plan- The court GRANTS the motion, and ORDERS that the Protocol attached as Exhibit "A" shall govern the electronic discovery conducted in this case. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 7/10/15. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (SAC )
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TEXT ORDER granting #34 "Joint Motion to Approve Claw Back Stipulation and Order." The court will enter separately "FRE 502(D) and (E) Claw back Stipulation and Order." Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 7-9-15. (AMW, )
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ORDER granting #33 Joint Motion for Approval of Stipulated Protective Order. The court will enter the Stipulated Protective Order separately. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 7-9-15. (AMW, )
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #30 Joint Motion to Approve Claw Back Stipulation and Order in light of the parties' filing of an amended Joint Motion to Approve Claw Back Stipulation and Order (doc. 34) with an amended exhibit (doc. 34-1). Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 7-9-15. (AMW, )
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #29 Joint Motion for Approval of Stipulated Protective Order in light of the parties' filing of an amended Joint Motion for Approval of Stipulated Protective Order (doc. 33) with an amended exhibit (doc. 33-1). Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 7-9-15. (AMW, )
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #28 Joint Motion for Approval of Electronic Discovery Plan in light of the parties' filing of an amended Joint Motion for Approval of Electronic Discovery Plan (doc. 32) with amended exhibits (docs. 32-1 & 32-2). Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 7-9-15. (AMW, )
July 9, 2015 Filing 35 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Friedman, Jeffrey)
July 9, 2015 Filing 34 Joint MOTION for Discovery To Approve Claw Back Stipulation and Order by Co-Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Friedman, Jeffrey)
July 9, 2015 Filing 33 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Co-Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Friedman, Jeffrey)
July 9, 2015 Filing 32 Joint MOTION for Discovery Approval of Electronic Discovery Plan by Co-Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Electronic Discovery Plan)(Friedman, Jeffrey)
July 7, 2015 Filing 31 AGENDA FOR JULY 14, 2015 CONFERENCE Having considered the agenda proposed in the parties' Joint Status Report for the next conference scheduled for Tuesday, July 14, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 5A at the Hugo L. Black United States Courthouse in Birmingham, Alabama, the court SETS agenda as outlined within. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 7/7/15. (SAC ) Modified on 7/8/2015 (SAC, ).
July 2, 2015 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for Discovery Claw Back Stipulation & Order by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Claw Back Stipulation & Order)(Friedman, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2015 Filing 29 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Approval by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulated Protective Order)(Friedman, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2015 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Discovery (Electronic Discovery Plan) Approval by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Friedman, Jeffrey)
June 29, 2015 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Class Action Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Co-Lead Counsel, Plaintiffs' Counsel.(Friedman, Jeffrey)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order as to ESI and as to ESI Protocol. Deadline to submit Proposed Protective Order as to ESI and as to ESI Protocol is RESET to July 3, 2015. (The court will be closed on July 3, 2015, but parties may file the Proposed Protective Order electronically.). Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 06/26/2015. (JPC)
June 26, 2015 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Unopposed) by Defendants' Counsel. (Smith, Richard)
June 24, 2015 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa M Ghannoum on behalf of Defendants' Counsel (Ghannoum, Lisa)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 3 with Preliminary Scheduling Order: As stated on the record of the June 4, 2015 Status Conference, the court SETS out the deadlines as outlined within; This matter is SET for a status conference on Tuesday, July 14, 2015 at 9:30 AM at the Hugo L. Black U.S. Courthouse; The PSC, Defense Counsel, and Local Liaison Counsel SHALL submit to the court via email on or before Monday, July 6, 2015 a JOINT Status Report proposing an Agenda for the July 14 status conference. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 6/18/15. (SAC )
June 18, 2015 Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 12/1/2016; Dispositive Motions due by 1/16/2017. (SAC, )
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #21 Renewed Motion for Extension of Time to File- The court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART this motion; the court grants an extension of the deadline for filing the Master Complaint, changing the deadline for filing it from June 15, 2015 to June 29, 2015, but the court denies the motion to the extent that it requests more time. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 6/5/15. (SAC )
June 4, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre: Status Conference held on 6/4/2015. Participating parties identified. Agenda items including deadlines discussed. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson.) (FNC)
June 2, 2015 Filing 21 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Master Complaint by Co-Lead Counsel, Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Friedman, Jeffrey)
May 27, 2015 Filing 20 AGENDA FOR JUNE 4, 2015 CONFERENCE The next conference is scheduled for Thursday, June 4, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 5A at the Hugo L. Black United States Courthouse in Birmingham, Alabama. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 5/27/15. (SAC )
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 5/27/15. (SAC )
May 26, 2015 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT Joint by Co-Lead Counsel. filed by Co-Lead Counsel (Friedman, Jeffrey)
May 26, 2015 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Master Complaint by Co-Lead Counsel, Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Friedman, Jeffrey)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER AMENDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2- granting #15 Motion [of] Co-Lead Counsel to Alter Case Management Order No. 2- The court AMENDS Case Management Order No. 2 (doc. 14) to remove Ari Scharg from the PSC, at Mr. Schargs request, and to fill the resulting vacancy on the PSC with Katrina Carroll of Lite DePalma Greenberg LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 5/11/15. (SAC ) Modified on 1/11/2017 (SAC ).
May 8, 2015 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Management Order No.2 by Co-Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Friedman, Jeffrey)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2- Leadership Appointments and duties as set out within; No later than June 15, 2015, Co-Lead Counsel SHALL file a unified class action complaint that for purposes of this MDL SHALL be the operative complaint and SHALL supersede all other complaints filed in any of the actions centralized in this MDL. This matter is SET for a status conference on Thursday, June 4, 2015 at 1:30 PM at the Hugo L. Black U.S. Courthouse, 1729 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama. The PSC, Defense Counsel, and Local Liaison Counsel SHALL submit to the court on or before noon on Tuesday, May 26, 2015, a JOINT Status Report. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 4/16/15. (SAC )
April 14, 2015 Filing 13 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel of Filing of Executed Waiver of the Service of Summons by Defendant Community Health Systems Professional Services Corporation Relating to the Keen case NDAL Case 2:15cv483 only (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Karon, Daniel) Modified on 4/14/2015 (FNC).
April 14, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre: Status Conference held on 4/14/2015. Steering Committee announced and confirmed in open court. Discussion on how case is to proceed and what is expected by the court. Next status conference scheduled for Thursday, June 4, 2015 at 1:30 PM, and will be set by separate order. (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson.) (FNC)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER In preparation for the Initial Status Conference in this matter, the court advises counsel that it has made the following leadership appointments: (1) Karen Riebel and Jeff Friedman as Co-Lead Counsel for the plaintiffs; and (2) Chris Hellums and Richard Smith as Local Liaison Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 4/13/15. (SAC )
April 8, 2015 Filing 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) from the Judicial Panel on MDL 2595 transferring 2 actions listed on schedule A to the Northern District of Alabama; 2:15-cv-593-KOB from ALM & 2:15-cv-594-KOB from WAE. (SAC )
April 8, 2015 Filing 10 AGENDA FOR INITIAL CONFERENCE Having considered the parties' Joint Proposed Agenda for Initial Conference, the court SETS the agenda for the Initial Status Conference scheduled for Tuesday, April 14, 2015 as outlined within. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 4/8/15. (SAC )
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Lifting Stay of CTO. - originally filed in NDAL on February 23, 2015. The stay of the Panel's conditional transfer order designated as "CTO-1" filed on February 6, 2015, is LIFTED - re: the Maes case(USDC NDAL Case No.: 2:15cv317) transferred from the District Court of New Mexico. (FNC)
April 6, 2015 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO -2); originally filed in NDAL March 23, 2015. (Attachments: #1 CTO 2 with Schedule; NDAL case number)(SAC )
April 6, 2015 Filing 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO -1); originally filed in NDAL February 17, 2015. (Attachments: #1 Schedule with NDAL case numbers listed)(SAC )
March 31, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey E Friedman on behalf of Plaintiffs' Counsel (Friedman, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Patrick Hayes on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hayes, Joshua)
March 31, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F Prince on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Prince, Robert)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 REGARDING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE This matter is SET for a status conference on Tuesday, April 14, 2015, at 1:30 P.M., in Courtroom 5A at the Hugo L. Black United States Courthouse; Joint Preliminary Report due on or before Tuesday, March 31, 2015; Attorneys interested in serving as Lead, Liaison, or Coordinating Counsel or on a committee of counsel to assist in coordination and management of the litigation, including temporary Lead, Liaison, or Coordinating Counsel, SHALL also submit to the undersigned via email on or before Tuesday, March 31, 2015 a request for appointment; Pending status conference set for 4/14/15, deadlines as set out within are STAYED; see within for further direction and deadlines. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/13/15. (SAC )
February 10, 2015 Filing 2 MOTION for Hearing (Motion for Status Conference) by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Foster, Greg)
February 4, 2015 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on MDL 2595 transferring 5 actions listed on schedule A to the Northern District of Alabama (included in those is 2:14-cv-1620-KOB originally filed in ALND; this order deemed filed in that case 2/4/15) (Attachments: #1 Schedule with NDAL case numbers)(SAC )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Community Health Systems Inc., MDL 2595
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Health Systems Inc., MDL 2595
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants' Counsel
Represented By: Lisa M Ghannoum
Represented By: Daniel Rubin Warren
Represented By: William R Taber, III
Represented By: Theodore Joseph Kobus, III
Represented By: DANIEL A. CUTLER
Represented By: Andy Lowry
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Hooks
Represented By: David Alan Carney
Represented By: Jimmy Dale Parrish
Represented By: Stuart T O'Neal, III
Represented By: Joe N Tatum
Represented By: Jacob M Tubbs
Represented By: Richard E Smith
Represented By: Jonathan W Macklem
Represented By: Michael J Dekleva
Represented By: Harry P McGrath, Jr.
Represented By: Jeremy Lloyd Carlson
Represented By: Paul Gregory Karlsgodt
Represented By: Bradley S. Clanton
Represented By: William C Madison
Represented By: Thomas L Kirkland, Jr
Represented By: Wynn M Shuford
Represented By: H. Barber Boone
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Timothy L. Warnock
Represented By: J Paul Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lead Counsel
Represented By: Daniel Rubin Warren
Represented By: William R Taber, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Local Liaison Counsel
Represented By: Christopher T Hellums
Represented By: Richard E Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Community Health Systems Inc
Represented By: William R Taber, III
Represented By: Richard E Smith
Represented By: John R Jacobson
Represented By: William Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Co-Lead Counsel
Represented By: Karen H Riebel
Represented By: Jeffrey E Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs' Counsel
Represented By: Troy N Giatras
Represented By: Greg William Foster
Represented By: Paula Knippa
Represented By: William R. Caroselli
Represented By: James M Terrell
Represented By: Joshua Patrick Hayes
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Represented By: Karen H Riebel
Represented By: Andrew England Brashier
Represented By: William Eric Colley
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Represented By: Christopher T Hellums
Represented By: C Gibson Vance
Represented By: Clinton H. Scott
Represented By: David S. Senoff
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: Dean J Arnold
Represented By: Edwin J Kilpela, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey E Friedman
Represented By: James A DeRoche
Represented By: Edward K Wood, Jr
Represented By: Mark Adam Jones
Represented By: Beau D. Hollowell
Represented By: D Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Ari J Scharg
Represented By: Benjamin S Thomassen
Represented By: Donald W Stewart
Represented By: Jason A. Medure
Represented By: Geoffrey E Parmer
Represented By: John Michael Bowling
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: David I. Mindell
Represented By: Jamisen A Etzel
Represented By: Mary Lou Boelcke
Represented By: Matthew John Zuchetto
Represented By: Darrell W Scott
Represented By: Evan Buxner
Represented By: T Dylan Reeves
Represented By: Jordan Sims Davis
Represented By: R G Methvin, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Johnson
Represented By: J. Douglas Gramling
Represented By: Julia A Beasley
Represented By: Anthony Anderson Benton Dogali
Represented By: Christopher J Zulanas
Represented By: Turner W Branch
Represented By: Michael Slack
Represented By: Rafey S. Balabanian
Represented By: James F. Humphreys
Represented By: Robert F Prince
Represented By: Daniel Richard Karon
Represented By: Margaret Moses Branch
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: John C. Ochoa
Represented By: Brian D Penny
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Special Master
Represented By: Edgar C Gentle, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?