Wilson v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Wilson and Lisa Wilson
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Imerys Talc America Inc, Personal Care Products Council, Cosmetic toiletry & Fragrance Association, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies Inc and Luzenac America Inc
Case Number: 2:2016cv01287
Filed: August 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2017 Filing 25 NOTICE by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies Inc Substitution of Counsel (Barton, James)
October 3, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by James C Barton, Jr on behalf of Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies Inc (Barton, James)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL 2738: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of New Jersey for inclusion in MDL 2738; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk emailed to Clerk of Court in District of New Jersey. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 10/25/2016. (PSM)
October 5, 2016 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa Wilson. All Defendants. (Meadows, Ted)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 9/15/16. (SMD)
September 14, 2016 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/24/2016. (PSM)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 9/14/2016. (PSM)
September 13, 2016 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Personal Care Products Council. filed by Personal Care Products Council (Lee, David)
September 13, 2016 Filing 18 Brief re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Personal Care Products Council. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lee, David)
September 13, 2016 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Personal Care Products Council. (Lee, David)
September 13, 2016 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by David A Lee on behalf of Personal Care Products Council (Lee, David)
September 9, 2016 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies Inc. filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies Inc (Downs, Helen)
September 9, 2016 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson & Johnson. filed by Johnson & Johnson (Downs, Helen)
September 9, 2016 Filing 13 Brief in Support of Motion to Stay All Proceedings. (Downs, Helen)
September 9, 2016 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings by Johnson & Johnson. (Downs, Helen)
September 9, 2016 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(c) by Johnson & Johnson. (Downs, Helen)
September 8, 2016 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Imerys Talc America Inc.(Eason, Leslie)
September 8, 2016 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Imerys Talc America Inc. filed by Imerys Talc America Inc (Eason, Leslie)
September 8, 2016 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Imerys Talc America Inc. (Eason, Leslie)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 8/31/16. (SMD)
August 31, 2016 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert Allen Smith, Jr. by Lisa Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Meadows, Ted)
August 31, 2016 PHV Fee paid: $50.00, receipt number 1126-2692458 (NDAL credit card receipt no. B4601074020). (Meadows, Ted) Modified on 8/31/2016 (YMB).
August 18, 2016 Filing 5 Summons Issued via certified mail as to Imerys Talc America Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies Inc, Personal Care Products Council. (YMB)
August 18, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andy D Birchfield, Jr on behalf of Lisa Wilson (Birchfield, Andy)
August 18, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by P Leigh O'Dell on behalf of Lisa Wilson (O'Dell, P)
August 16, 2016 Filing Fee Received: $400, Receipt# 1126-2682975 (ALND# B4601073719). (Meadows, Ted) Modified on 8/16/2016 (AVC)
August 11, 2016 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie K Eason on behalf of Imerys Talc America Inc (Eason, Leslie)
August 4, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Imerys Talc America Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies Inc, Personal Care Products Council, filed by Lisa Wilson.(KAM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Wilson
Represented By: Robert Allen Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Represented By: P Leigh O'Dell
Represented By: Andy D Birchfield, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Helen K Downs
Represented By: James C Barton, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America Inc
Represented By: Leslie K Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Personal Care Products Council
Represented By: David A Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cosmetic toiletry & Fragrance Association
Represented By: David A Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies Inc
Represented By: James C Barton, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luzenac America Inc
Represented By: Leslie K Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?