Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Miranda et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: Jose Maria Cerrillo, Los Arcos VIII LLC, Rafael Esquivel Miranda, Rafael Esquivel Miranda Individually, and as officers, directors, shareholders, principals, managers and/or members of LOS ARCOS VIII, L.L.C., d/b/a LOS ARCOS, Los Arcos VIII LLC d/b/a Los Arcos and Jose Maria Cerrillo Individually, and as officers, directors, shareholders, principals, managers and/or members of LOS ARCOS VIII, L.L.C., d/b/a LOS ARCOS
Case Number: 2:2018cv00417
Filed: March 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 47:605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' responsive pleadings are due by May 17, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 5/10/2018. (CDG)
May 10, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion is RIPE 5/10/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Jose Maria Cerrillo, Los Arcos VIII LLC, Rafael Esquivel Miranda. (Kuffner, Christopher)
May 10, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S Kuffner on behalf of Jose Maria Cerrillo, Los Arcos VIII LLC, Rafael Esquivel Miranda (Kuffner, Christopher)
May 10, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to All Defendants Motion is RIPE 5/10/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Entry of Default)(Sinor, Andrew) Modified docket text to reflect Clerk's Entry of Default on 5/14/2018 (MRR, ).
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER- More than twenty-one days have elapsed since defts Rafael Esquivel Miranda, Jose Maria Cerrillo, and Los Arcos VIII, LLC were served and the defts have failed to answer or respond; It is ORDERED that pltf show cause within fourteen (14) days why this action should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 5/4/18. (MRR, )
April 12, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Jose Maria Cerrillo served on 4/11/2018, answer due 5/2/2018; Los Arcos VIII LLC served on 4/11/2018, answer due 5/2/2018; Rafael Esquivel Miranda served on 4/11/2018, answer due 5/2/2018. (KEK)
April 10, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Jose Maria Cerrillo, Los Arcos VIII LLC, Rafael Esquivel Miranda. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
April 10, 2018 Filing 6 Request for service by certified mail filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (Sinor, Andrew)
April 10, 2018 Filing 5 Request for service by certified mail filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (Sinor, Andrew)
April 10, 2018 Filing 4 Request for service by certified mail filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (Sinor, Andrew)
March 26, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3052740 (ALND B4601087716) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Jose Maria Cerrillo, Los Arcos VIII LLC, Rafael Esquivel Miranda, filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc.(KEK). (Sinor, Andrew) Modified on 3/26/2018 (KEK).
March 16, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK)
March 16, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (KEK)
March 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jose Maria Cerrillo, Los Arcos VIII LLC, Rafael Esquivel Miranda, filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Miranda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: Andrew J Sinor, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Maria Cerrillo
Represented By: Christopher S Kuffner
Represented By: David Andrew Bozeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Arcos VIII LLC
Represented By: Christopher S Kuffner
Represented By: David Andrew Bozeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Esquivel Miranda
Represented By: Christopher S Kuffner
Represented By: David Andrew Bozeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Esquivel Miranda Individually, and as officers, directors, shareholders, principals, managers and/or members of LOS ARCOS VIII, L.L.C., d/b/a LOS ARCOS
Represented By: Christopher S Kuffner
Represented By: David Andrew Bozeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Arcos VIII LLC d/b/a Los Arcos
Represented By: Christopher S Kuffner
Represented By: David Andrew Bozeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Maria Cerrillo Individually, and as officers, directors, shareholders, principals, managers and/or members of LOS ARCOS VIII, L.L.C., d/b/a LOS ARCOS
Represented By: Christopher S Kuffner
Represented By: David Andrew Bozeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?