Powell-Coker v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Steffany Powell-Coker
Defendant: Patrick Whitehead, Donald Craine, Kraig Barner, Todd Reynolds, Dale Brown, Stephen Weatherman, Steve Wilburn, Rodney Moore, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Inc., Darrel Green, Ray Wallace and Jay Trawick
Case Number: 2:2018cv01094
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #16 Amended Complaint by Rodney Moore, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Inc.. (Turner, Michael)
September 13, 2018 Filing 23 Brief re #22 Second MOTION to Dismiss (Rule 12(b)(6)) filed by Kraig Barner, Dale Brown, Donald Craine, Darrel Green, Rodney Moore, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Inc., Todd Reynolds, Jay Trawick, Ray Wallace, Stephen Weatherman, Patrick Whitehead, Steve Wilburn. (Turner, Michael)
September 13, 2018 Filing 22 Second MOTION to Dismiss (Rule 12(b)(6)) by Kraig Barner, Dale Brown, Donald Craine, Darrel Green, Rodney Moore, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Inc., Todd Reynolds, Jay Trawick, Ray Wallace, Stephen Weatherman, Patrick Whitehead, Steve Wilburn. (Turner, Michael)
September 10, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed Jay Trawick served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018. (AFS)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER finding as moot #6 Motion to Dismiss; granting #17 Motion to Withdraw; granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #16 Amended Complaint Kraig Barner answer due 9/13/2018; Dale Brown answer due 9/13/2018; Donald Craine answer due 9/13/2018; Darrel Green answer due 9/13/2018; Rodney Moore answer due 9/13/2018; Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Inc. answer due 9/13/2018; Todd Reynolds answer due 9/13/2018; Jay Trawick answer due 9/13/2018; Ray Wallace answer due 9/13/2018; Stephen Weatherman answer due 9/13/2018; Patrick Whitehead answer due 9/13/2018; Steve Wilburn answer due 9/13/2018. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 9/7/2018. (AFS)
September 6, 2018 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to First Amended Complaint by Kraig Barner, Dale Brown, Donald Craine, Darrel Green, Rodney Moore, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Inc., Todd Reynolds, Jay Trawick, Ray Wallace, Stephen Weatherman, Patrick Whitehead, Steve Wilburn. (Turner, Michael)
August 30, 2018 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Jay Trawick mailed by certified mail. (AFS)
August 28, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw Pending Motion to Dismiss with Leave to File New Motion Addressed to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Kraig Barner, Dale Brown, Donald Craine, Darrel Green, Rodney Moore, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Inc., Todd Reynolds, Jay Trawick, Jay Traywick, Ray Wallace, Stephen Weatherman, Patrick Whitehead, Steve Wilburn. (Frazier, Sydney)
August 23, 2018 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Steffany Powell-Coker.(Farris, Kirby)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #11 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. Plaintiff is ordered to file her Amended Complaint by August 23, 2018. ORDER GRANTING #8 MOTION for Extension of Time. Defendants' Answer is due fourteen (14) days after the Court rules on the pending Motion to Dismiss. ORDER FINDING AS MOOT #10 MOTION for Extension of Time in light of the Plaintiff's response in opposition to the motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 8/22/2018. (JLC)
August 21, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Sydney F Frazier, Jr on behalf of Kraig Barner, Dale Brown, Donald Craine, Darrel Green, Rodney Moore, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Inc., Todd Reynolds, Ray Wallace, Stephen Weatherman, Patrick Whitehead, Steve Wilburn (Frazier, Sydney)
August 21, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance for Crawford S. McGivaren, Jr. and Sydney F. Frazier, Jr. by Kraig Barner, Dale Brown, Donald Craine, Darrel Green, Rodney Moore, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Inc., Todd Reynolds, Ray Wallace, Stephen Weatherman, Patrick Whitehead, Steve Wilburn. (Frazier, Sydney)
August 21, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Steffany Powell-Coker. (Farris, Kirby)
August 21, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Steffany Powell-Coker. (Farris, Kirby)
August 21, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time by Steffany Powell-Coker. (Farris, Kirby)
August 9, 2018 Filing 9 BRIEFING SCHEDULE: re #6 MOTION to Dismiss, #8 MOTION for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's responses are due 8/21/2018. Defendants' replies, if any, are due by 8/28/2018. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 8/9/2018. (AFS)
August 8, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time by Kraig Barner, Dale Brown, Donald Craine, Darrel Green, Rodney Moore, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Inc., Todd Reynolds, Ray Wallace, Stephen Weatherman, Patrick Whitehead, Steve Wilburn. (Turner, Michael)
August 8, 2018 Filing 7 Brief re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kraig Barner, Dale Brown, Donald Craine, Darrel Green, Rodney Moore, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Inc., Todd Reynolds, Ray Wallace, Stephen Weatherman, Patrick Whitehead, Steve Wilburn. (Turner, Michael)
August 8, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Kraig Barner, Dale Brown, Donald Craine, Darrel Green, Rodney Moore, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Inc., Todd Reynolds, Ray Wallace, Stephen Weatherman, Patrick Whitehead, Steve Wilburn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit to Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss)(Turner, Michael)
July 23, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steffany Powell-Coker. Darrel Green served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018; Rodney Moore served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018; Stephen Weatherman served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018; Steve Wilburn served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. (AFS)
July 19, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steffany Powell-Coker. Kraig Barner served on 7/18/2018, answer due 8/8/2018; Dale Brown served on 7/18/2018, answer due 8/8/2018; Donald Craine served on 7/18/2018, answer due 8/8/2018; Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Inc. served on 7/18/2018, answer due 8/8/2018; Todd Reynolds served on 7/18/2018, answer due 8/8/2018; Ray Wallace served on 7/18/2018, answer due 8/8/2018; Patrick Whitehead served on 7/18/2018, answer due 8/8/2018. (AFS, )
July 17, 2018 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number B4601090613 (AFS)
July 17, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kraig Barner, Dale Brown, Donald Craine, Darrel Green, Rodney Moore, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Inc., Todd Reynolds, Ray Wallace, Stephen Weatherman, Patrick Whitehead, Steve Wilburn mailed certified mail. (AFS)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 Conflict Disclosure by Steffany Powell-Coker (AFS)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kraig Barner, Dale Brown, Donald Craine, Darrel Green, Rodney Moore, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Inc., Todd Reynolds, Ray Wallace, Stephen Weatherman, Patrick Whitehead, Steve Wilburn, filed by Steffany Powell-Coker.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell-Coker v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Whitehead
Represented By: Sydney F Frazier, Jr
Represented By: Crawford S McGivaren, Jr
Represented By: Michael E Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Craine
Represented By: Sydney F Frazier, Jr
Represented By: Crawford S McGivaren, Jr
Represented By: Michael E Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraig Barner
Represented By: Sydney F Frazier, Jr
Represented By: Crawford S McGivaren, Jr
Represented By: Michael E Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Reynolds
Represented By: Sydney F Frazier, Jr
Represented By: Crawford S McGivaren, Jr
Represented By: Michael E Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Brown
Represented By: Sydney F Frazier, Jr
Represented By: Crawford S McGivaren, Jr
Represented By: Michael E Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Weatherman
Represented By: Sydney F Frazier, Jr
Represented By: Crawford S McGivaren, Jr
Represented By: Michael E Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Wilburn
Represented By: Sydney F Frazier, Jr
Represented By: Crawford S McGivaren, Jr
Represented By: Michael E Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Moore
Represented By: Sydney F Frazier, Jr
Represented By: Crawford S McGivaren, Jr
Represented By: Michael E Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Inc.
Represented By: Sydney F Frazier, Jr
Represented By: Crawford S McGivaren, Jr
Represented By: Michael E Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel Green
Represented By: Sydney F Frazier, Jr
Represented By: Crawford S McGivaren, Jr
Represented By: Michael E Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Wallace
Represented By: Sydney F Frazier, Jr
Represented By: Crawford S McGivaren, Jr
Represented By: Michael E Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Trawick
Represented By: Sydney F Frazier, Jr
Represented By: Crawford S McGivaren, Jr
Represented By: Michael E Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steffany Powell-Coker
Represented By: Kirby D Farris
Represented By: Jessica Marie Zorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?