Bartlett et al v. Hames et al

Plaintiff: Kayla Carreker and Tomeka Bartlett
Defendant: Christi Hames Dolbeer, Miranda Hames Self, Jessica Hames Penner, Randy Allan Hames, Mary Catherine Hames, Hames Marina LLC and Angela Hames Sahurie
Case Number: 2:2018cv01096
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: T Michael Putnam
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER re #14 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by Mary Catherine Hames, Angela Hames Sahurie, Miranda Hames Self, Christi Hames Dolbeer, Jessica Hames Penner, #10 MOTION to Stay filed by Randy Allan Hames, Hames Marina LLC. Hearing on both motions is SET for Wednesday, 9/26/2018, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3B, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. To the extent that counsel for any party seeks to submit further argument of authority, and brief must be filed no later than September 21, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 9/13/2018. (PMA)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 INITIAL ORDER - GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 9/13/2018. (ASL)
September 12, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Status Conference held in chambers on 9/12/2018. (ASL)
September 12, 2018 Filing 20 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Christi Hames Dolbeer, Randy Allan Hames, Mary Catherine Hames, Miranda Hames Self, Angela Hames Sahurie, Tomeka Bartlett, Hames Marina LLC, Jessica Hames Penner, Kayla Carreker. (KEK, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE to remind parties of consent conference scheduled for 10:00 AM on Wednesday, 9/12/18; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, by Tuesday, 9/11/18, the conference will be cancelled (ASL)
September 4, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Stay filed by Tomeka Bartlett, Kayla Carreker. (Danley, Lacey)
August 27, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Leave to Amend Their Complaint filed by Tomeka Bartlett, Kayla Carreker. (McGowan, Candis) Modified docket text to reflect title of the document on 8/28/2018 (MRR, ).
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than September 27, 2018. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after September 27, 2018. A status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on September 12, 2018, in chambers. The conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 8/20/18. (MRR, )
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER re #10 MOTION to Stay filed by Randy Allan Hames, Hames Marina LLC. Any opposition may be filed within 21 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 8/14/2018. (PMA)
August 13, 2018 Filing 14 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by Christi Hames Dolbeer, Mary Catherine Hames, Jessica Hames Penner, Angela Hames Sahurie, Miranda Hames Self. (Kilgo, Jerry)
August 13, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry Lee Kilgo on behalf of Christi Hames Dolbeer, Mary Catherine Hames, Jessica Hames Penner, Angela Hames Sahurie, Miranda Hames Self (Kilgo, Jerry)
August 10, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hames Marina LLC. filed by Hames Marina LLC (Stott, Joseph)
August 10, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Randy Allan Hames. filed by Randy Allan Hames (Stott, Joseph)
August 10, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay by Randy Allan Hames, Hames Marina LLC. (Stott, Joseph)
August 10, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E Stott on behalf of Randy Allan Hames, Hames Marina LLC (Stott, Joseph)
August 1, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Miranda Hames Self served (no date entered on green card)(MRR, )
July 30, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Angela Hames Sahurie served on 7/27/2018, answer due 8/17/2018. (MRR, )
July 25, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tomeka Bartlett, Kayla Carreker. Mary Catherine Hames served on 7/23/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. (KEK)
July 23, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Christi Hames Dolbeer served on 7/21/2018, answer due 8/11/2018; Randy Allan Hames served on 7/21/2018, answer due 8/11/2018; Hames Marina LLC served on 7/21/2018, answer due 8/11/2018. (MRR, )
July 19, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Christi Hames Dolbeer, Mary Catherine Hames, Randy Allan Hames, Hames Marina LLC, Jessica Hames Penner, Angela Hames Sahurie, Miranda Hames Self mailed by certified mail. (AFS)
July 18, 2018 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number ALND B4601090626 (AFS)
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Tomeka Bartlett, Kayla Carreker. (McGowan, Candis)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tomeka Bartlett, Kayla Carreker.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartlett et al v. Hames et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christi Hames Dolbeer
Represented By: Jerry Lee Kilgo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miranda Hames Self
Represented By: Jerry Lee Kilgo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Hames Penner
Represented By: Jerry Lee Kilgo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Allan Hames
Represented By: Joseph E Stott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Catherine Hames
Represented By: Jerry Lee Kilgo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hames Marina LLC
Represented By: Joseph E Stott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Hames Sahurie
Represented By: Jerry Lee Kilgo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Carreker
Represented By: Lacey K Danley
Represented By: Robert Champ Crocker
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomeka Bartlett
Represented By: Lacey K Danley
Represented By: Robert Champ Crocker
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?