Baxley et al v. Howard et al
Plaintiff: William J Baxley and Marie A Prat Baxley
Defendant: Steel Excel Inc and Jack L Howard
Case Number: 2:2018cv01104
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER This case is REMANDED back to the Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 7/30/2018. (AFS)
July 27, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Lyn Crank on behalf of Marie A Prat Baxley, William J Baxley (Crank, Ashley)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS reminding parties of their obligations under FRCP26(f) - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 7/25/2018. (KSS)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/19/2018; Pretrial Conference set for 2/5/2020 at 10:30 AM; Jury Trial set for 3/23/2020 at 9:00 AM; BOTH in the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 7/19/2018. (AFS)
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jack L Howard, Steel Excel Inc. filed by Jack L Howard, Steel Excel Inc (Burkhalter, Carl)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Jack L Howard, Steel Excel Inc.(Burkhalter, Carl)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jack L Howard, Steel Excel Inc from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2018-902344, filed by Jack L Howard, Steel Excel Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(KEK)
July 18, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $400.00, (ALND B4601090659) receipt_number 1126-3134652. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jack L Howard, Steel Excel Inc from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2018-902344, filed by Jack L Howard, Steel Excel Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(KEK). (Burkhalter, Carl) Modified on 7/19/2018 (AFS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baxley et al v. Howard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steel Excel Inc
Represented By: Carl S Burkhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack L Howard
Represented By: Carl S Burkhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J Baxley
Represented By: Deborah Alley Smith
Represented By: Sharon D Stuart
Represented By: Ashley Lyn Crank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie A Prat Baxley
Represented By: Deborah Alley Smith
Represented By: Sharon D Stuart
Represented By: Ashley Lyn Crank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?