Covey v. Colonial Pipeline Company et al

Plaintiff: John Christopher Covey
Defendant: Colonial Pipeline Company and LE Bell Construction Company Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01121
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Southern Office
County: Shelby
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER granting #24 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorneys Kyle V. Miller and Lem E. Montgomery, III, but with the understanding and on the condition they pay the applicable fee and register for e-filing and notification within 14 days, unless they have already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/17/2018. (AVC)
September 17, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3174968. (Barley, Matthew)
September 17, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3174946. (Barley, Matthew)
September 17, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice Motion is RIPE 9/17/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Colonial Pipeline Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kyle V. Miller, #2 Certificate of Good Standing for Kyle V. Miller, #3 Declaration of Lem E. Montgomery, III, #4 Certificate of Good Standing for Lem E. Montgomery, III)(Barley, Matthew)
September 17, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John H England, III: Telephone Conference held on 9/17/2018; Attorney Whit Drake present by phone for pltf Covey; Attorneys Alan Mathis and Matthew Barley present by phone for dft Colonial Pipeline Company; Attorney Sean Shirley present by phone for dft LE Bell Construction Company Inc; consent process discussed; conf. adj. (AVC)
September 7, 2018 Filing 23 REPLY to #15 Plaintiff's Objection and Response to Colonial Pipeline Company's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and/or Alternatively Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint filed by Colonial Pipeline Company. (Barley, Matthew)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER terminating #21 Motion for Leave to Appear, as it is a notice of appearance rather than a motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 9/7/2018. (CDG)
September 7, 2018 Filing 21 APPEARNACE of Counsel Filed by John Christopher Covey. (Bruce, Mary)
September 7, 2018 Filing 20 JOINDER in #16 Motion for Temporary Stay of Discovery filed by John Christopher Covey. (Drake, G)
September 4, 2018 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Colonial Pipeline Company. filed by Colonial Pipeline Company (Barley, Matthew)
September 4, 2018 Filing 18 JOINDER in #16 Motion for Temporary Stay of Discovery filed by Colonial Pipeline Company. (Barley, Matthew)
September 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER re #16 MOTION to Stay filed by LE Bell Construction Company Inc. Any opposition is due by September 14, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 9/3/2018. (CDG)
August 31, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Temporary Stay of Discovery to Attempt to Develop a Discovery Coordination Plan for the CR-251 Related Litigation by LE Bell Construction Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - NTSB Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - Webster Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - 1 Delaughder NOR and Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3 - 2 Delaughder NOR and Complaint, #5 Exhibit 3 - 3 Delaughder NOR and Complaint, #6 Exhibit 4 - Covey Complaint, #7 Exhibit 5 - Willingham Complaint, #8 Exhibit 6 - Gentry Complaint)(Shirley, Sean)
August 31, 2018 Filing 15 OBJECTION and Response to #8 Rule 26(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and/or Alternatively Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint filed by John Christopher Covey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Drake, G)
August 30, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Clements on behalf of LE Bell Construction Company Inc (Clements, Katherine)
August 30, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles A Burkhart on behalf of LE Bell Construction Company Inc (Burkhart, Charles)
August 23, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Related Actions by LE Bell Construction Company Inc. (Shirley, Sean)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/22/2018. (KEK)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than October 1, 2018. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after October 1, 2018. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on September 17, 2018. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The parties should call in five minutes prior to the start time of the conference. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/22/2018. (KEK)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER setting briefing schedule re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Colonial Pipeline Company. Plaintiff's response is due by August 31, 2018. Defendant's reply, if any, is due by September 7, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 8/21/2018. (CDG)
August 17, 2018 Filing 8 RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Colonial Pipeline Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A to Colonial's Motion to Dismiss)(Barley, Matthew)
August 16, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LE Bell Construction Company Inc. filed by LE Bell Construction Company Inc (Shirley, Sean)
August 16, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by LE Bell Construction Company Inc.(Shirley, Sean)
August 1, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Christopher Covey. Colonial Pipeline Company served on 7/27/2018. (AFS)
July 25, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Colonial Pipeline Company, LE Bell Construction Company Inc by certified mail. (AFS)
July 23, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601090721 (MRR, )
July 23, 2018 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by John Christopher Covey. (Drake, G)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Colonial Pipeline Company, LE Bell Construction Company Inc, filed by John Christopher Covey.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Covey v. Colonial Pipeline Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial Pipeline Company
Represented By: Kyle V Miller
Represented By: Matthew A Barley
Represented By: Lem E Montgomery, III
Represented By: Alan D Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LE Bell Construction Company Inc
Represented By: Katherine Clements
Represented By: Charles A Burkhart
Represented By: Sean Shirley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Christopher Covey
Represented By: G Whit Drake
Represented By: Mary Amari Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?