Rahim v. State of Alabama Department of the Secretary of State Election Committee et al
Plaintiff: Hiram Girard Rahim
Defendant: State of Alabama Governor of the State of Alabama and State of Alabama Department of the Secretary of State Election Committee
Case Number: 2:2018cv01348
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - The court dismissed Rahims case without prejudice because the court found that his claims lacked a basis in either law or fact. At this juncture, however, Rahim did not allege any violation of his federal constitutional rights. See doc. 1. Indeed, Rahim did not allege any facts to indicate that he filed, or attempted to file, a signature petition to appear on the ballot for governor of Alabama as an independent candidate, nor did he allege any facts to suggest that the State prevented him from doing so. See id. Therefore, as discussed in the courts prior order, Rahims complaint against the State and its governor lacks an arguable basis in law and fact. As a result, the court DENIES Rahims motion to reconsider, doc. 4. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 10/18/2018. (KEK)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Order #3 filed by Hiram Girard Rahim. (KEK)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER #2 MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED; and this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 8/23/2018. (AFS)
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Hiram Girard Rahim. (AFS)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State of Alabama Department of the Secretary of State Election Committee, State of Alabama Governor of the State of Alabama, filed by Hiram Girard Rahim.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rahim v. State of Alabama Department of the Secretary of State Election Committee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hiram Girard Rahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama Governor of the State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama Department of the Secretary of State Election Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?