Estate of Michael Lee Pierce, The v. BBH BMC LLC et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Michael Lee Pierce, The
Defendant: Brookwood Baptist Medical Center, BBH BMC LLC and BBH BMC LLC doing business as Brookwood Baptist Medical Center
Case Number: 2:2018cv01381
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint by BBH BMC LLC.(Fleming, Charles)
October 23, 2018 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Fleming, Charles)
October 17, 2018 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BBH BMC LLC, filed by Estate of Michael Lee Pierce, The.(Brooks, Gerald)
October 16, 2018 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BBH BMC LLC. filed by BBH BMC LLC (Fleming, Charles)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/3/18. (MRR, )
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - re Doc #11 All claims against Brookwood Medical Center are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i); Pltf is ORDERED to file, within ten (10) calendar days, an amended complaint addressing the jurisdictional pleading issues identified during the October 3, 2018 status conference; Further instructions within; The parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than November 5, 2018. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after November 5, 2018.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/3/18. (MRR, )
October 3, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Estate of Michael Lee Pierce, The (Brooks, Gerald)
October 3, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius: Status Conference held on 10/3/2018: attys Gerald Brooks, Jr. and Charles Fleming present; conf adj. (chambers) (MSN)
October 2, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Summer A Wells on behalf of Estate of Michael Lee Pierce, The (Wells, Summer)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: This matter is SET for a telephone status conference at 10:00 a.m. on October 3, 2018. The parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1831 five minutes before the status conference is scheduled to begin. The access code is 2778178. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/1/18. (MRR, )
September 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B Almond on behalf of BBH BMC LLC (Almond, Michael)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter J Price, III on behalf of BBH BMC LLC (Price, Walter)
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BBH BMC LLC.(Fleming, Charles)
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estate of Michael Lee Pierce, The. BBH BMC LLC served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (Brooks, Gerald)
August 29, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estate of Michael Lee Pierce, The. Brookwood Baptist Medical Center served on 8/29/2018, answer due 9/19/2018. (Brooks, Gerald)
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BBH BMC LLC, Brookwood Baptist Medical Center, returned to pltf for service (MRR, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BBH BMC LLC, Brookwood Baptist Medical Center, filed by Estate of Michael Lee Pierce, The.(MRR, )
August 28, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601091586 (MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Michael Lee Pierce, The v. BBH BMC LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookwood Baptist Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBH BMC LLC
Represented By: Michael B Almond
Represented By: Charles J Fleming, Jr
Represented By: Walter J Price, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBH BMC LLC doing business as Brookwood Baptist Medical Center
Represented By: Michael B Almond
Represented By: Charles J Fleming, Jr
Represented By: Walter J Price, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Michael Lee Pierce, The
Represented By: Gerald Clark Brooks, Jr
Represented By: Summer A Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?