Finishing Solutions LLC v. Bayer AG et al

Plaintiff: Finishing Solutions LLC
Defendant: Wanhua Chemical Group Co Ltd, Mitsui Chemicals America Inc, BASF SE, Mitsui Chemicals Inc, BASF Corporation, Wanhua Chamical America Co Ltd, MCNS Polyurethanes USA Inc, MCNS, Huntsman Corporation, Huntsman International LLC, Bayer AG, Covestro LLC, Bayer Corporation and Dow Chemical Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv01391
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Western District of Pennsylvania for inclusion in MDL 2862; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of Western District of Pennsylvania. (KAM)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER; This case is before the court on the parties' Agreed Motion to Extend All Deadlines Until After the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Rules on Pending Motion for Transfer #9 . For good cause shown, the motion #9 is GRANTED. All deadlines are EXTENDED and the case is STAYED until 28 calendar days after the JPML rules on the pending Motion for Transfer. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/14/2018. (JLC)
September 14, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl S Burkhalter on behalf of Dow Chemical Company (Burkhalter, Carl)
September 14, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time AGREED MOTION TO EXTEND ALL DEADLINES UNTIL AFTER THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION RULES ON PENDING MOTION FOR TRANSFER by Dow Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Burkhalter, Carl)
September 14, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dow Chemical Company. filed by Dow Chemical Company (Burkhalter, Carl)
September 14, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl S Burkhalter on behalf of Dow Chemical Company (Burkhalter, Carl)
September 14, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan P Moltz on behalf of Dow Chemical Company (Moltz, Evan)
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Finishing Solutions LLC. BASF Corporation served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018; Bayer Corporation (green card signed but not dated)served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018; Covestro LLC served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018; Dow Chemical Company served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018; Huntsman Corporation served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018; Huntsman International LLC served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018; Mitsui Chemicals America Inc served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018; Wanhua Chamical America Co Ltd served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (KAM)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Finishing Solutions LLC. MCNS Polyurethanes USA Inc served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (KAM)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BASF Corporation, Covestro LLC, Dow Chemical Company, Huntsman Corporation, Huntsman International LLC, MCNS Polyurethanes USA Inc, Mitsui Chemicals America Inc, Wanhua Chamical America Co Ltd. mailed certified mail (KAM)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Finishing Solutions LLC. (Hellums, Christopher)
August 30, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3162663. related document #1 COMPLAINT against BASF Corporation, BASF SE, Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Covestro LLC, Dow Chemical Company, Huntsman Corporation, Huntsman International LLC, MCNS, MCNS Polyurethanes USA Inc, Mitsui Chemicals America Inc, Mitsui Chemicals Inc, Wanhua Chamical America Co Ltd, Wanhua Chemical Group Co Ltd, filed by Finishing Solutions LLC.(KAM). (Hellums, Christopher) NDAL rec# B4601091608
August 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BASF Corporation, BASF SE, Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Covestro LLC, Dow Chemical Company, Huntsman Corporation, Huntsman International LLC, MCNS, MCNS Polyurethanes USA Inc, Mitsui Chemicals America Inc, Mitsui Chemicals Inc, Wanhua Chamical America Co Ltd, Wanhua Chemical Group Co Ltd, filed by Finishing Solutions LLC.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finishing Solutions LLC v. Bayer AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanhua Chemical Group Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsui Chemicals America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF SE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsui Chemicals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanhua Chamical America Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCNS Polyurethanes USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntsman Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntsman International LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covestro LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Carl S Burkhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Finishing Solutions LLC
Represented By: Jonathan S Mann
Represented By: J Elliott Walthall
Represented By: Christopher T Hellums
Represented By: James F Barger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?