Compston v. Alza Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Robin J Compston
Defendant: Mylan Technologies Inc, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc and Alza Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv01460
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Referring Judge: T Michael Putnam
Nature of Suit: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: Attorney W. Larkin Radney, IV has moved to admit Clem C. Trischler pro hac vice in this action. (Doc. #10 ). The Court GRANTS the Motion. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 10/2/2018. (YMB)
October 2, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3187182 (ALND B4601092431). (Radney, W) Modified on 10/3/2018 (KEK).
September 26, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Clem C. Trischler by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc, Mylan Technologies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A certificate of good standing)(Radney, W)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Attorney W. Larkin Radney, IV has moved to admit Jason M. Reefer pro hac vice in this action. (Doc. #8 ). The Court GRANTS the Motion. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 9/24/2018. (YMB)
September 21, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3179024 (ALND B4601092196). (Radney, W) Modified on 9/24/2018 (KEK).
September 21, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc, Mylan Technologies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Radney, W)
September 19, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc, Mylan Technologies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Approval Letter, #2 Exhibit B MFTS labeling)(Radney, W)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Madeline Hughes Haikala. Please use case number 2:18-cv-1460-MHH on all subsequent pleadings. (MRR, )
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alza Corporation. filed by Alza Corporation (Babington, Joseph)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Ashby Pate on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc, Mylan Technologies Inc (Pate, Robert)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc, Mylan Technologies Inc. filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc, Mylan Technologies Inc (Radney, W)
September 7, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3168418 (ALND B4601091862) related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc, Mylan Technologies Inc from Circuit Court of Shelby County, case number 58-cv-2017-90045., filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc, Mylan Technologies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(MRR, ). (Radney, W) Modified on 9/7/2018 (KEK).
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc, Mylan Technologies Inc from Circuit Court of Shelby County, case number 58-cv-2017-90045., filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc, Mylan Technologies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Compston v. Alza Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Technologies Inc
Represented By: W Larkin Radney, IV
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Represented By: Jason M Reefer
Represented By: Clem C Trischler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: W Larkin Radney, IV
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Represented By: Jason M Reefer
Represented By: Clem C Trischler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alza Corporation
Represented By: Joseph P H Babington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin J Compston
Represented By: Stephen D Heninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?