Therabionic, LLC v. Costa

Plaintiff: Therabionic, LLC
Defendant: Frederico Perego Costa
Case Number: 2:2018cv01498
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
0 Judge: Karon O Bowdre
1 Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2018 27 Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Karon O. Bowdre. Please use case number 2:18-cv-1498-KOB on all subsequent pleadings. (MRR, )
November 2, 2018 26 Featured Case ORDER- The pltf's notice of voluntary dismissal of Count III of its amended complaint (Doc #21 ) is DENIED; Because the pltf has already amended its complaint once as a matter of course (Doc #14 ), further amendment requires the defendants written consent or the courts leave. See FED. R. CIV. P. 15(a).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 11/2/18. (MRR, )
November 1, 2018 25 Brief in Support of Subject Matter Jurisdiction re #24 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Brief on Jurisdiction and in Further Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Brief on Jurisdiction and in Further Support of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C to Brief on Jurisdiction and in Further Support of Notice of Removal)(Blanton, Sela) Modified docket text to reflect title of document on 11/2/2018 (MRR, ).
November 1, 2018 24 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Frederico Perego Costa from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number CV-2017-00248. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Second Amended Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Second Amended Notice of Removal)(Blanton, Sela) Modified docket text to reflect title of document on 11/2/2018 (MRR, ).
November 1, 2018 23 Brief re #22 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (White, J)
November 1, 2018 22 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Therabionic, LLC. (White, J)
October 30, 2018 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Count III of Amended Complaint by Therabionic, LLC (White, J) Modified docket text to reflect title of document on 10/30/2018 (MRR, ).
October 19, 2018 20 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: The motions of Christopher Kinkade, Johnathan R. Lagarenne, and Gerard P. Norton for leave to appear pro hac vice (Docs. 15, 16 & 17) are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/19/2018. (KEK)
October 19, 2018 19 Featured Case ORDER - It is ORDERED that the parties shall submit briefs addressing the issue of subject matter jurisdiction discussed during the October 18, 2018 telephone conference on or before November 1, 2018. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the time for the defendant to respond to the amended complaint filed on October 17, 2018, is extended to November 15, 2018. The motion to dismiss the original complaint is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as MOOT, subject to the defendants right to raise the grounds for that motion in response to the amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/19/2018. (KEK)
October 19, 2018 18 Featured Case ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order for Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than November 1, 2018. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is DIRECTED to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after November 1, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/19/2018. (KEK)
October 18, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius: Telephone Conference held on 10/18/2018; attys Mark White, Augusta Dowd, Chambers Waller, Gerard Norton, Christopher Kinkaid, Victoria Summerfield, William taylor and Sela Blanton present by telephone; conf adj. (chambers) (MSN)
October 18, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3198287 (ALND B4601092823). (Waller, William) Modified on 10/18/2018 (KEK).
October 18, 2018 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion is RIPE 10/18/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Therabionic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Waller, William)
October 18, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3198282 (ALND B4601092822). (Waller, William) Modified on 10/18/2018 (KEK).
October 18, 2018 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion is RIPE 10/18/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Therabionic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Waller, William)
October 18, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3198270 (ALND B4601092821). (Waller, William) Modified on 10/18/2018 (KEK).
October 18, 2018 Docket Change: Party text for both plaintiff and defendant changed to reflect text on the Amended Complaint Doc 14. (MRR, )
October 18, 2018 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion is RIPE 10/18/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Therabionic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Waller, William)
October 17, 2018 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Therabionic, LLC, filed by Therabionic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(White, J)
October 16, 2018 13 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: This case is SET for a telephone conference at 10:30 A.M. on October 18, 2018. The parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1831 five minutes before the telephone conference is scheduled to begin. The access code is 2778178. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/16/18. (MRR, )
October 10, 2018 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Frederico Perego Costa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion to Dismiss)(Smith, Alfred)
October 10, 2018 11 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Frederico Perego Costa (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Amended Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Amended Notice of Removal)(Smith, Alfred) Modified docket text to reflect title of the document on 10/11/2018 (MRR, ).
September 20, 2018 10 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: During a telephone conference held on September 19, 2018, the undersigned discussed deficiencies in the jurisdictional allegations contained in the defendant's notice of removal. The defendant SHALL correct these deficiencies by filing an amended notice of removal on or before October 10, 2018. The amended notice of removal SHALL be complete and not incorporate by reference or refer back to a previously filed document. Additionally, the deadline for the defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint is extended to October 10, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 9/20/18. (MRR, )
September 19, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius: Telephone Conference held on 9/19/2018; attys Augusta Dowd, Chambers Waller, Sela Blanton and Will Taylor present by telephone; conf adj. (chambers) (MSN)
September 18, 2018 9 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: The motions of William M. Taylor and Victoria D. Summerfield for leave to appear pro hac vice (Docs. #7 & #8 ) are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 9/18/18. (MRR, )
September 18, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3175442 (B4601092096). (Blanton, Sela) Modified on 9/18/2018 (MRR, ).
September 18, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3175440 (B4601092095). (Blanton, Sela) Modified on 9/18/2018 (MRR, ).
September 18, 2018 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Victoria D. Summerfield Motion is RIPE 9/18/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Frederico Perego Costa. (Blanton, Sela)
September 18, 2018 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William M. Taylor Motion is RIPE 9/18/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Frederico Perego Costa. (Blanton, Sela)
September 18, 2018 6 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: The text order entered on September 17, 2018 (Doc. 5 ) is VACATED. A telephone conference remains SET for September 19, 2018 at 10:30 A.M. (See Doc. 3 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 9/18/18. (MRR, )
September 17, 2018 5 Featured Case **VACATED**TEXT ORDER:A telephone status conference is currently set for 10:30 a.m. on September 19, 2018. (Doc. 3 ). The parties are REMINDED that the status conference will be cancelled by separate order if, prior to the date of the conference, all parties submit forms indicating whether they consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 9/17/2018. (MSN) Modified *VACATED pursuant to Order 6* on 9/18/2018 (MRR, ).
September 14, 2018 4 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
September 14, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3173248 (B4601092045). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Frederico Perego Costa from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-CV-2017-000248.00., filed by Frederico Perego Costa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC). (Smith, Alfred) Modified on 9/14/2018 (MRR, ).
September 14, 2018 3 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: This case is SET for a telephone conference at 10:30 A.M. on September 19, 2018. The parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1831 five minutes before the telephone conference is scheduled to begin. The access code is 2778178. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 9/14/18. (MRR, )
September 14, 2018 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Augusta S Dowd on behalf of Therabionic, LLC (Dowd, Augusta)
September 13, 2018 COMPLAINT against Frederico Perego Costa, filed by Therabionic, LLC. (Deemed filed 6/1/2018 in the Circuit Court of Jefferson County, attached to the Notice of Removal as Exhibit A @ p4).(JLC)
September 13, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Frederico Perego Costa from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-CV-2017-000248.00., filed by Frederico Perego Costa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Therabionic, LLC v. Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Therabionic, LLC
Represented By: William Chambers Waller, IV
Represented By: J Mark White
Represented By: Christopher Robert Kinkade
Represented By: Jonathan Lagarenne
Represented By: Augusta S Dowd
Represented By: Gerard P Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederico Perego Costa
Represented By: Alfred F Smith, Jr
Represented By: Sela Stroud Blanton
Represented By: Victoria Summerfield
Represented By: William Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?