Haman Inc v. Chubb Custom Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Haman Inc and Haman Inc d/b/a Knights Inn
Defendant: Chubb Custom Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv01534
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Referring Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER. Certain deadlines and time limits apply, as set out herein. Discovery due by 9/30/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 11/25/2019; Joint Status Report due by 1/11/2019, 6/3/2019 and 10/2/2019; Status Conference set for 10/9/2019 at 10:30 AM, eighth floor chambers, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre. This case should be ready for trial by May, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 11/15/2018. (FNC)
November 13, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre: Scheduling Conference by telephone held on 11/13/2018. Written order to follow. (FNC)
November 13, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE to re #16 Order to Show Cause filed by Chubb Custom Insurance Company. (Sherman, Michelle)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Defendant Chubb Custom Insurance Company is hereby ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE, in writing, why the Court should not grant Plaintiff Haman, Inc.s #15 Motion to Dismiss and Answer to Counterclaim of Defendant Chubb Custom Insurance Company. Chubb shall file its Response to this Order to Show Cause on or before November 13, 2018. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/30/2018. (JLC)
October 29, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss and Answer to Counterclaim of Defendant Chubb Custom Insurance Company by Haman Inc. (Conchin, Gary)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference by TELEPHONE for Tuesday, November 13, 2018 at 04:00 PM, before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre. The court will provide the call-in information to the parties by email. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/29/2018. (FNC
October 24, 2018 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Smith, Jason)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with appendices attached. **The report also should contain a synopsis of the case advising the court of the general claims and defenses of the parties. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/10/2018. (FNC)
October 4, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE the status conference scheduled for 10/17/2018 is canceled. (AFS)
October 4, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre. Magistrate Judge John H England, III no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 2:18-cv-1534-KOB for all subsequent pleadings. (AFS)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/20/2018. (AFS)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than November 3, 2018. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after November 3, 2018. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:30 a.m. on October 17, 2018. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/20/2018. (AFS)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #4 & #5 Motions to Admit Pro Hac Vice attorneys Wayne D. Taylor and Michelle A. Sherman, but with the understanding and on the condition they pay the applicable fee and register for e-filing and notification within 14 days, unless they have already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/19/2018. (AVC)
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and, COUNTERCLAIM (with exhibits) against Haman Inc by Chubb Custom Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter 2/25/2015 Howarth to Chubb, #3 Exhibit 3 - Letter 1/11/2016Montgomery to Visram, #4 Exhibit 4 - Letter 3/15/2018 Montgomery to Smith, #5 Exhibit 5 - Letter 7/6/2015 Howarth to Chubb, #6 Exhibit 6 - Letter 12/10/2015 Chubb to Conchin, #7 Exhibit 7 - Letter 12/14/2015 Montgomery to Haman, #8 Exhibit 8 - Letter 3/6/2018 Chubb to Visram)(Hess, Mark)
September 19, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $50.00, (ALNB B4601092130)receipt number 1126-3176518. (Hess, Mark) Modified on 9/20/2018 (AFS).
September 19, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $50.00, (ALND B4601092131) receipt number 1126-3176506. (Hess, Mark) Modified on 9/20/2018 (AFS).
September 19, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Michelle A. Sherman Motion is RIPE 9/19/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Chubb Custom Insurance Company. (Hess, Mark)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Wayne D. Taylor Motion is RIPE 9/19/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Chubb Custom Insurance Company. (Hess, Mark)
September 19, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $400.00, (ALND B4601092128) receipt_number 1126-3176435. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chubb Custom Insurance Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-cv-2018-903183.00., filed by Chubb Custom Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(AFS). (Hess, Mark) Modified on 9/19/2018 (AFS).
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Chubb Custom Insurance Company (AFS)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chubb Custom Insurance Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-cv-2018-903183.00., filed by Chubb Custom Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haman Inc v. Chubb Custom Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haman Inc
Represented By: Jason R Smith
Represented By: Gary V Conchin
Represented By: Franklin Taylor Rouse
Represented By: Kenneth Bridges Cole, Jr
Represented By: Gregory A Brockwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haman Inc d/b/a Knights Inn
Represented By: Jason R Smith
Represented By: Gary V Conchin
Represented By: Franklin Taylor Rouse
Represented By: Kenneth Bridges Cole, Jr
Represented By: Gregory A Brockwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Custom Insurance Company
Represented By: Michelle A Sherman
Represented By: Wayne D Taylor
Represented By: Mark D Hess
Represented By: Wayne David Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?