Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. FHP Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: FHP Construction, Inc. and Stonecraft Roofing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01669
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bessho, David)
November 16, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FHP Construction, Inc.. filed by FHP Construction, Inc. (Lightner, Hansel)
November 16, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Stonecraft Roofing, LLC by FHP Construction, Inc..(Lightner, Hansel)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with appendices attached. **The report also should contain a synopsis of the case advising the court of the general claims and defenses of the parties. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 11/13/2018. (FNC)
November 12, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisha L Graham on behalf of FHP Construction, Inc. (Graham, Lisha)
November 12, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Hansel Eli Lightner, II on behalf of FHP Construction, Inc. (Lightner, Hansel)
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Stonecraft Roofing, LLC.(Wilson, David)
November 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Admit David Bessho Pro Hac Vice. The court advises counsel that it may require at least one attorney for each party to be physically present at every hearing and status conference. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 11/4/18. (MMW)
November 2, 2018 PHV Fee paid for David M Bessho in the amount of $50.00, Credit Card receipt number 1126-3210766, NDAL receipt #B4601093216. (Scott, John) Modified on 11/5/2018 (JLC).
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Scott, John)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Stonecraft Roofing, LLC served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Gamble, Kara) Modified on 10/22/2018 (JLC).
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. FHP Construction, Inc. served on 10/12/2018, answer due 11/2/2018. (Gamble, Kara)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to FHP Construction, Inc. and Stonecraft Roofing, LLC, returned to Plaintiff's attorney for service on this the 11th day of October, 2018. (JLC)
October 11, 2018 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3193232, NDAL receipt #B4601092689. (Scott, John) Modified on 10/11/2018 (JLC).
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FHP Construction, Inc., Stonecraft Roofing, LLC, filed by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. FHP Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FHP Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Hansel Eli Lightner, II
Represented By: Lisha L Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stonecraft Roofing, LLC
Represented By: David M Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: John W Scott
Represented By: Kara Deal Gamble
Represented By: David M Bessho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?