Winther et al v. United States Steel Corporation
Plaintiff: Tracey Winther and Matthew T Winther
Defendant: United States Steel Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv01693
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Truitt, J)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER - Unless expressly directed otherwise, the parties SHALL comply with all provisions of this Initial Order in the litigation of this action. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/2/2018. (KEK)
November 2, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3210196. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Steel Corporation from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 68-cv-2017-900806, filed by United States Steel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A1, # 2 Exhibit A2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(KEK). (Truitt, J) NDAL rec# B4601093189 Modified on 11/16/2018 (KAM).
November 1, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE the status conference scheduled for 11/14/2018 is CANCELLED. (AFS)
November 1, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge R David Proctor. Magistrate Judge John H England, III no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 2:18-cv-01693-RDP for all subsequent pleadings. (AFS)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/16/2018. (KEK)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than November 29, 2018. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after November 29, 2018. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on November 14, 2018. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The parties should call in five minutes prior to the start time of the conference. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/16/2018. (KEK)
October 15, 2018 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by United States Steel Corporation. [deemed filed in Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, Bessemer Division on 1/27/2017] (AVC)
October 15, 2018 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States Steel Corporation, filed by Matthew T Winther, Tracey Winther. [deemed filed in Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, Bessemer Division on 12/7/2017](AVC)
October 15, 2018 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint (Notice of Removal) by United States Steel Corporation. [deemed filed in Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, Bessemer Division on 12/13/2017] (AVC)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by United States Steel Corporation. (KEK)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Steel Corporation from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 68-cv-2017-900806, filed by United States Steel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1, #2 Exhibit A2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winther et al v. United States Steel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Winther
Represented By: Michael B Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew T Winther
Represented By: Michael B Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Steel Corporation
Represented By: J Alan Truitt
Represented By: D Bart Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?