Education Corporation of America et al v. United States Department of Education et al
Plaintiff: Virginia College LLC, New England College of Business and Finance LLC and Education Corporation of America
Defendant: Betsy Devos, United States Department of Education and R&W Rentals, LLC
Intervenor: Southern Plaza, LLC
Amicus Curiae: Southern Poverty Law Center
Case Number: 2:2018cv01698
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting re #55 MOTION of Emmanuelle M Verdieu to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Southern Poverty Law Center, #56 MOTION of Joshua D> Rovenger to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Southern Poverty Law Center. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 11/9/2018. (AFS)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting re #43 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Brian P. Welch for Putative Intervenor filed by Southern Plaza, LLC. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 11/9/2018. (AFS)
November 5, 2018 Filing 60 ***Pursuant to Order #59 ***Document Sealed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9) (AFS)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re #49 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 9 to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Amicus Curiae Brief is GRANTED; #50 Plaintiffs' Motions for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to the Amicus Curiae Brief is GRANTED; #52 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to the Defendants' Supplemental Memorandum is GRANTED. In accordance with its #58 memorandum opinion, this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 11/5/2018. (AFS)
November 5, 2018 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 11/5/2018. (AFS)
November 5, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $50.00, receipt number B4601093230 (AFS)
November 5, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Tae Phillips on behalf of Fair Forest of Greenville, LLC (Phillips, Matthew)
November 5, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Southern Poverty Law Center. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joshua D. Rovenger, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Zampierin, Sara)
November 5, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $50.00, receipt number 1126-3211198 ALND rec# B4601093229. (Zampierin, Sara) Modified on 11/5/2018 (AFS).
November 5, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Southern Poverty Law Center. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Emmanuelle M. Verdieu, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Zampierin, Sara)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER the court construes the plaintiffs' Unopposed #15 MOTION to Correct Exhibits, as a motion to seal plaintiffs' exhibits 1-5 and 2-4, and GRANTS the motion to seal. The court GRANTS plaintiffs' #26 MOTION to Correct Exhibits. Accordingly, the court deems page 2 of doc. 26-1 to place page 19 of doc. 24-2, and page 3 of doc. 26-1 to replace page 27 of doc. 24-2. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 11/5/2018. (AFS)
November 2, 2018 Filing 53 REPLY to re #48 to United States' Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Appointment of a Receiver and for Injunctive Relief filed by Education Corporation of America, New England College of Business and Finance LLC, Virginia College LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cleveland, Ollie)
November 2, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to the Defendants' Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Appointment of a Receiver and for Injunctive Relief by Education Corporation of America, New England College of Business and Finance LLC, Virginia College LLC. (Cleveland, Ollie)
November 2, 2018 Filing 51 Opposition to re #45 Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Education Corporation of America, New England College of Business and Finance LLC, Virginia College LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Cleveland, Ollie)
November 2, 2018 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Opposition to the Amicus Curiae Brief by Education Corporation of America, New England College of Business and Finance LLC, Virginia College LLC. (Cleveland, Ollie)
November 2, 2018 Filing 49 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 9 to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Amicus Curiae Brief by Education Corporation of America, New England College of Business and Finance LLC, Virginia College LLC. (Cleveland, Ollie)
November 2, 2018 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Appoint Receiver MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Supplemental Brief) filed by Betsy Devos, United States Department of Education. (Pham, Danielle)
November 1, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert H Adams on behalf of Collegiate Admission & Retention Solutions, LLC (Adams, Robert)
November 1, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda T Cubbage on behalf of Kennington Valley View LLC (Cubbage, Brenda)
October 31, 2018 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Appoint Receiver MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Southern Poverty Law Center. (Zampierin, Sara)
October 31, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $50.00, receipt number B4601093125 re #43 MOTION for Leave to File Application for Admission PHV (AFS)
October 31, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by John D Elrod on behalf of EC Chandler Refi 2017, LLC and Warner Chandler 2017 LLC (Elrod, John)
October 30, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to File Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Brian P. Welch for Putative Intervenor by Southern Plaza, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Brian P. Welch)(Turner, Michael)
October 30, 2018 Filing 42 MOTION to Intervene of Landlord, Southern Plaza, LLC, and for Related Relief to Excuse Compliance with the Pleading Requirement of Rule 24(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Southern Plaza, LLC. (Turner, Michael)
October 30, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick L Lowther on behalf of Las Vegas Associates, LLLP (Lowther, Patrick)
October 30, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua H Threadcraft on behalf of Kaplan Higher Education LLC, Kaplan Inc (Threadcraft, Joshua)
October 30, 2018 Filing 39 Exhibit List by EC Chandler REfi 2017, LLC and Warner Chandler 2017, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted exhibit)(KSS)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER In accordance with Rule 65(b)(2) of the FRCP, this #12 Order, shall be EXTENDED by seven (7) days to and including November 5, 2018, in accordance herewith, the temporary injunction will expire at 5:00 p.m. Central Standard Time on November 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 10/29/2018. (KSS)
October 29, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Abdul K Kallon: Hearing held on 10/29/2018 Court heard arguments. Exhibit 1-Redacted document made part of the record. Parties participated by phone. Order to be entered by the court. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (KSS)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 10/29/2018. (AFS)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 10/29/2018. (AFS)
October 29, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $50.00, receipt number B4601093067 re #23 (AFS)
October 29, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION for Joinder OF PIONEER INDUSTRIAL LLC AND PIONEER PARKING LOT, LLC TO NATIONAL RETAIL PROPERTIES, LPS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO EMERGENCY MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER AND ENTRY OF A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by Pioneer Industrial, LLC, Pioneer Parking Lot, LLC. (Campbell, Andrew)
October 29, 2018 Filing 34 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/18/2018, before Judge Abdul K. Kallon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sabrina Lewis. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 11/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2019. (AFS)
October 29, 2018 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Appoint Receiver MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Gleneagles Office, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Gilchrist, Wesley)
October 29, 2018 Filing 32 JOINDER in re #2 filed by Gulf States Properties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Joinder)(Childs, Larry)
October 29, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE by R&W Rentals, LLC of Appearance on behalf of Lessor R&W Rentals, LLC (Griffin, Thomas)
October 29, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee R Benton on behalf of National Retail Properties, LP (Benton, Lee)
October 27, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $50.00, (ALND B4601093066)receipt number 1126-3205284. (Joseph, Joe) Modified on 10/30/2018 (AFS).
October 27, 2018 Filing 29 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Receiver and Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Yael D. Aufgang)(Joseph, Joe)
October 27, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy P. Cole by Kaplan Higher Education LLC, Kaplan Inc. (Joseph, Joe)
October 27, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Joe A Joseph on behalf of Kaplan Inc, Kaplan Higher Education LLC (Joseph, Joe)
October 27, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to Amend/Correct #24 Reply Brief, (Supplemental Declaration of M. Ranchino, filed at D.E. 24-2) by Education Corporation of America, New England College of Business and Finance LLC, Virginia College LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cleveland, Ollie)
October 26, 2018 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Appoint Receiver MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by National Retail Properties, LP. (Morris, Brenton)
October 26, 2018 Filing 24 REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiffs Education Corporation of America, New England College of Business and Finance LLC, Virginia College LLC re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Appoint Receiver MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Education Corporation of America, New England College of Business and Finance LLC, Virginia College LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Cleveland, Ollie) **Pursuant to Order #54 court deems page 2 of doc. 26-1 to replace page 19 of doc. 24-2, and page 3 of doc. 26-1 to replace page 27 of doc. 24-2.Modified on 11/5/2018 (AFS).
October 26, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BSF Richmond, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Michael M. Eidelman)(Prueter, Charles)
October 26, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Walton Prueter on behalf of BSF Richmond, L.P. (Prueter, Charles)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - This matter is before the court on the parties joint motion for leave to file additional pages. Doc. 17. The motion is GRANTED. The defendants may exceed the courts page limitation for their response brief by 12 pages, for a total of 27 pages. The plaintiffs may exceed the courts page limitation for their reply brief by 10 pages, or a total of 15 pages. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 10/26/2018. (KEK)
October 26, 2018 Filing 20 JOINDER in re #2 filed by BSF Richmond, L.P.. (Childs, Larry)
October 24, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Appoint Receiver MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Betsy Devos, United States Department of Education. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Shari Mecca, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Rhonda Puffer)(Jacobson, Jonathan)
October 24, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Education Corporation of America, New England College of Business and Finance LLC, Virginia College LLC. Betsy Devos served on 10/19/2018, answer due 12/18/2018; United States Department of Education served on 10/19/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (Cleveland, Ollie) Modified on 10/24/2018 (JLC).
October 24, 2018 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Education Corporation of America, New England College of Business and Finance LLC, Virginia College LLC. (Cleveland, Ollie)
October 23, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Education Corporation of America, New England College of Business and Finance LLC, Virginia College LLC re #12 Order,, Terminate Motions, #14 Order (Cleveland, Ollie)
October 23, 2018 Filing 15 Emergency MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Appoint Receiver MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Exhibits 1-5; 2-4) by Education Corporation of America, New England College of Business and Finance LLC, Virginia College LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cleveland, Ollie)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that Schedule 1 to the #12 Order Granting Temporary Injunctive Relief is attached and incorporated in to the Order by reference. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 10/22/2018. (AFS)
October 22, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle A Pham on behalf of All Defendants (Pham, Danielle)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order as set out herein. A hearing on Plaintiffs' request for, inter alia, a preliminary injunction and for the appointment of a receiver, as more particularly described in the Motion, shall be held on October 29, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time in Courtroom 4A of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, 1729 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, AL before Judge Abdul K. Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 10/19/2018. (JLC)
October 19, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Edward Jacobson on behalf of All Defendants (Jacobson, Jonathan)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - 1. The United States response (the Response) to the Motion shall be filed and served by electronic mail on counsel to the Plaintiffs no later than 4:00 p.m. Central Time on October 24, 2018. 2. Any reply by Plaintiffs to the Response shall be filed and served by electronic mail on counsel to the United States no later than 4:00 p.m. Central Time on October 26, 2018. 3. The Court shall conduct a hearing (the Hearing) on the Motion on October 29, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 10/18/2018. (KEK)
October 18, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing set for 10/29/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4A of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Parties participating by telephone shall dial 888-557-8511 and enter access code 4541204, five minutes prior to the designated call time (KSS)
October 18, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Abdul K Kallon: Motion Hearing held on 10/18/2018 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Appoint Receiver MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by New England College of Business and Finance LLC, Education Corporation of America, Virginia College LLC. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (KSS, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lane H Woodke on behalf of All Defendants (Woodke, Lane)
October 18, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lester Marshall on behalf of Betsy Devos, United States Department of Education (Marshall, Mary)
October 17, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Plaintiffs Unopposed Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stuart M. Brown and Benjamin S. Boyd (Docs. 4, 5) are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 10/16/2018. (KEK)
October 16, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Appoint Receiver MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2018 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 4A of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. (KSS)
October 16, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3196776 (ALND B4601092782). (Cleveland, Ollie) Modified on 10/17/2018 (KEK).
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin S. Boyd by Education Corporation of America, New England College of Business and Finance LLC, Virginia College LLC. (Cleveland, Ollie)
October 16, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3196663 (ALND B4601092780). (Cleveland, Ollie) Modified on 10/17/2018 (KEK).
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stuart M. Brown by Education Corporation of America, New England College of Business and Finance LLC, Virginia College LLC. (Cleveland, Ollie)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Betsy Devos, United States Department of Education; del to pla for service. (KWC)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION to Appoint Receiver, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Education Corporation of America, New England College of Business and Finance LLC, Virginia College LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(KEK) **Pursuant to Order #54 exhibit 2-4 sealed. Modified on 11/5/2018 (AFS).
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Betsy Devos, United States Department of Education (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ALND B4601092770), filed by Education Corporation of America, New England College of Business and Finance LLC, Virginia College LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(KEK) **Pursuant to Order #54 exhibit 1-5 sealed. Modified on 11/5/2018 (AFS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Education Corporation of America et al v. United States Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betsy Devos
Represented By: Lane H Woodke
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Jacobson
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Represented By: Danielle A Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Education
Represented By: Lane H Woodke
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Jacobson
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Represented By: Danielle A Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&W Rentals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia College LLC
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: Stuart M Brown
Represented By: Ollie A Cleveland, III
Represented By: John Leland Murphree
Represented By: Benjamin S Boyd
Represented By: Michael M Eidelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New England College of Business and Finance LLC
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: Stuart M Brown
Represented By: Ollie A Cleveland, III
Represented By: John Leland Murphree
Represented By: Benjamin S Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Education Corporation of America
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: Stuart M Brown
Represented By: Ollie A Cleveland, III
Represented By: John Leland Murphree
Represented By: Benjamin S Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Southern Plaza, LLC
Represented By: Brian P Welch
Represented By: Michael E Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Southern Poverty Law Center
Represented By: Sara M Zampierin
Represented By: Joshua D Rovenger
Represented By: Emmanuelle Marie Verdieu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?