Gross v. Energen Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Melvin Gross
Defendant: William G Hargett, Energen Corporation, Alan Kleier, Vincent J Intrieri, Lori A Lancaster, Frances Powell Hawes, M James Gorrie, James T McManus, II, Jonathan Z Cohen, Jay Grinney and Kenneth W Dewey
Case Number: 2:2018cv01711
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - this case is before the court on plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal #15 ; Dismissal is with prejudice as to plaintiff Melvin Gross and w/out prejudice as to claims by the putative class members.. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/27/2018. (KAM)
November 21, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Melvin Gross (Guin, David)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDERThis matter is before the court on the motions for admission pro hac vice filed on behalf of Rachelle Silverberg and Tamara Livshiz #12 #13 . The motions #12 , #13 are GRANTED.. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/13/2018. (KAM)
November 9, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Tamara Livshiz by Jonathan Z Cohen, Kenneth W Dewey, Energen Corporation, M James Gorrie, Jay Grinney, William G Hargett, Frances Powell Hawes, Vincent J Intrieri, Alan Kleier, Lori A Lancaster, James T McManus, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mays, Joseph)
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rachelle Silverberg by Jonathan Z Cohen, Kenneth W Dewey, Energen Corporation, M James Gorrie, Jay Grinney, William G Hargett, Frances Powell Hawes, Vincent J Intrieri, Alan Kleier, Lori A Lancaster, James T McManus, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mays, Joseph)
November 9, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3214893. (Mays, Joseph)
November 9, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3214888. (Mays, Joseph)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITAL ORDER. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/5/2018. (KAM)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on the parties' Joint Motion and Stipulation Regarding Time to Move, Plead or Otherwise Respond to Complaint #9 . For good cause shown, the Motion #9 is GRANTED. Within 15 days after the entry of an Order appointing lead plaintiff(s) and lead counsel in this action, the lead plaintiff(s) and the Defendants SHALL confer and propose to the court dates by which (1) lead plaintiff(s) shall either (a) serve and file a consolidated class action complaint that shall serve as the operative complaint in this action and shall supersede all other complaints filed in and/or transferred to this court, or (b) notify Defendants' counsel that the original complaint filed by lead plaintiff(s) will be the operative complaint in this action; and (2) Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the operative complaint. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/5/2018. (KAM)
November 2, 2018 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #7 Summons Returned Executed, #5 Summons Returned Executed,, by Jonathan Z Cohen, Kenneth W Dewey, Energen Corporation, M James Gorrie, Jay Grinney, William G Hargett, Frances Powell Hawes, Vincent J Intrieri, Alan Kleier, Lori A Lancaster, James T McManus, II. (Mays, Joseph)
October 30, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Melvin Gross re #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear,, PHV of Richard A. Acocelli (Acocelli, Richard)
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melvin Gross. Lori A Lancaster served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/12/2018. (KAM)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER conditionally granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV of Richard A. Acocelli; On or before October 30, 2018, Attorney Acocelli SHALL:1. Certify to the court that she has read and understands:(a) any local rules applicable in this District;(b) the Alabama State Bar Code of Professional Courtesy and the Lawyers Creed, which can be accessed at: https://www.alabar.org/membership/code-of-professional-courtesy/, https://www.alabar.org/membership/lawyers-creed/; and(c) this courts CM/ECF requirements.Failure to submit the above items will result in vacatur of the conditional grant of the motion. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/24/2018. (KAM)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melvin Gross. Jonathan Z Cohen served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/12/2018; Kenneth W Dewey served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/12/2018; Energen Corporation served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/12/2018; M James Gorrie served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/12/2018; Jay Grinney served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/12/2018; William G Hargett served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/12/2018; Frances Powell Hawes served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/12/2018; Vincent J Intrieri served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/12/2018; Alan Kleier served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/12/2018; James T McManus, II served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/12/2018. (KAM, )
October 23, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3202253. (Guin, David)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Richard A. Acocelli by Melvin Gross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Guin, David)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jonathan Z Cohen, Kenneth W Dewey, Energen Corporation, M James Gorrie, Jay Grinney, William G Hargett, Frances Powell Hawes, Vincent J Intrieri, Alan Kleier, Lori A Lancaster, James T McManus, II via certified U.S. Mail on this the 19th day of October, 2018. (JLC)
October 19, 2018 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3199500, NDAL receipt #B4601092848. (Guin, David) Modified on 10/19/2018 (JLC).
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Melvin Gross. (KAM)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jonathan Z Cohen, Kenneth W Dewey, Energen Corporation, M James Gorrie, Jay Grinney, William G Hargett, Frances Powell Hawes, Vincent J Intrieri, Alan Kleier, Lori A Lancaster, James T McManus, II, filed by Melvin Gross.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gross v. Energen Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William G Hargett
Represented By: Joseph B Mays, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energen Corporation
Represented By: Joseph B Mays, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Kleier
Represented By: Joseph B Mays, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent J Intrieri
Represented By: Joseph B Mays, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori A Lancaster
Represented By: Joseph B Mays, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances Powell Hawes
Represented By: Joseph B Mays, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M James Gorrie
Represented By: Joseph B Mays, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James T McManus, II
Represented By: Joseph B Mays, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Z Cohen
Represented By: Joseph B Mays, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Grinney
Represented By: Joseph B Mays, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth W Dewey
Represented By: Joseph B Mays, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Gross
Represented By: Tammy McClendon Stokes
Represented By: David J Guin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?