Drummond Company, Inc. v. Collingsworth et al
Plaintiff: Drummond Company Inc
Defendant: Terrence P Collingsworth and Conrad & Scherer, LLP
Respondent: Douglas Von Allmen
Case Number: 2:2018cv01753
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 65 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 0:16-cv-60511. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 22, 2018 Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (lk) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting 62 Motion to Change Venue to the Northern District of Alabama. Case is Closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 10/22/2018. See attached document for full details. (lk) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 63 Clerks Notice to Filer re #61 Notice (Other), 62 MOTION to Transfer. Two or More Document Events Filed as One; ERROR - Only one event was selected by the Filer but more than one event was applicable to the document filed. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but in the future, the Filer must select all applicable events. (mc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 62 MOTION to Transfer by Drummond Company, Inc., Conrad & Scherer, LLP. Responses due by 11/2/2018 (See DE #61 for image)(mc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE by Drummond Company, Inc. re #59 Order Parties' Joint Notice and Motion to Transfer (Barfield, Brett) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Conrad & Scherer, LLP for dates of 10/19/18 through 10/29/18 (O'Brien, Russell) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 8/21/2018. See attached document for full details. (eaa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 58 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Status Conference held on 8/21/2018. Order to follow. Total time in court: 9 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Russell Robert O'Brien, Brett Alan Barfield, H. Thomas Wells, III, William Paulk, Jonathan Feldman. (Digital 15:02:12) (wc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 PAPERLESS ORDER Resetting Telephonic Status Conference. The Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/20/2018 at 1:00 PM is hereby RESET to 8/21/2018 at 3:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Counsel shall call the conference number 1-888-684-8852 at the appointed time, then enter access code 4791317 and security code 0821. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 8/20/2018. (jsa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 8/20/2018 at 1:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Counsel shall call the conference number 1-888-684-8852 at the appointed time, then enter access code 4791317 and security code 0820. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 8/1/2018. (eaa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
August 1, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE by Drummond Company, Inc. re #38 Order Staying Case, Terminate Motions Parties' Joint Notice Regarding Lifting of Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order) (Barfield, Brett) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER REQUIRING SIXTH JOINT STATUS REPORT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 6/19/2018. (eaa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 53 STATUS REPORT by Conrad & Scherer, LLP (O'Brien, Russell) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER REQUIRING FIFTH JOINT STATUS REPORT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 3/20/2018. (eaa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
March 19, 2018 Filing 51 STATUS REPORT by Conrad & Scherer, LLP (O'Brien, Russell) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER REQUIRING FOURTH JOINT STATUS REPORT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 12/20/2017. (eaa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
December 20, 2017 Filing 49 STATUS REPORT THIRD JOINT STATUS REPORT by Conrad & Scherer, LLP (Frevola, Albert) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER REQUIRING THIRD JOINT STATUS REPORT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 9/25/2017. (eaa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
September 22, 2017 Filing 47 STATUS REPORT by Conrad & Scherer, LLP (Frevola, Albert) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 9/21/2017. (eaa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
September 21, 2017 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Albert L. Frevola, Jr.. by Conrad & Scherer, LLP. Responses due by 10/5/2017 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Conrad & Scherer, LLP's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw from Representing Douglas Von Allemen.)(Frevola, Albert) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
September 15, 2017 Filing 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Dewey Turner on behalf of Douglas Von Allmen. Attorney Paul Dewey Turner added to party Douglas Von Allmen(pty:res). (Turner, Paul) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REQUIRING SECOND JOINT STATUS REPORT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 6/27/2017. (eaa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
June 26, 2017 Filing 42 STATUS REPORT by Conrad & Scherer, LLP (O'Brien, Russell) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
June 21, 2017 Filing 41 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re 40 Order on Miscellaneous Case - Contested. Case converted to a contested civil case per Order. (asl) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Paperless Order directing the Clerk of Court to re-designate this matter as a contested civil case for statistical purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 6/21/2017. (eaa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
June 19, 2017 Set Deadlines per #39 Order. Status Report due by 7/5/2017. (asl) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS REPORT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 6/19/2017. (eaa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Staying Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 10/19/2016. (eaa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
October 18, 2016 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION to Stay by Conrad & Scherer, LLP. Responses due by 11/4/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(O'Brien, Russell) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
September 7, 2016 Filing 36 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Motion Hearing held on 9/7/2016 re #21 MOTION to Transfer pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(f) re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, filed by Drummond Company, Inc. APPEARANCES: FOR THE PLAINTIFF - BRETT BARFIELD, ESQ. AND H. THOMAS WELLS, III, ESQ.; FOR DEFENDANT CONRAD & SCHERER, LLP - ALBERT FREVOLA, JR., ESQ., FOR NON-PARTY DOUGLAS VON ALLMEN - ALBERT FREVOLA, JR., ESQ. Order to follow. (Digital 10:02:33.) (sl) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #32 Unopposed MOTION to Seal 33 Sealed Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 9/1/2016. (ear) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
August 31, 2016 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Transfer pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(f) re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, filed by Drummond Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rothenberg, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
August 31, 2016 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 33 restricted/sealed until further notice. (1182951) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
August 31, 2016 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Drummond Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (Text of Proposed Order)) (Rothenberg, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Telephonic Hearing on #21 MOTION to Transfer for 9/7/2016 at 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Counsel shall call the conference number 1-888-684-8852 at the appointed time, then enter access code 4791317# and security code 0907#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 8/30/2016. (ear) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
August 19, 2016 Filing 30 RESPONSE/REPLY to #24 Response/Reply (Other),, by Conrad & Scherer, LLP. (O'Brien, Russell) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
August 19, 2016 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Transfer pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(f) re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, filed by Conrad & Scherer, LLP. Replies due by 8/29/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Collingsworth subpoena objection letter March 2016, #2 Exhibit 2 - Drummond's Motion to Transfer Case to ND Alabama)(Frevola, Albert) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 8/8/2016. (ear) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
August 8, 2016 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for Entry of Briefing Schedule on Motion to Transfer by Conrad & Scherer, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Parties' Joint Motion for Entry of Briefing Schedule)(Frevola, Albert) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #22 Unopposed MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 8/1/2016. (eno) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
August 1, 2016 Filing 25 Clerks Notice to Filer re #24 Response/Reply (Other),,. Document Not Linked; ERROR - The filed document was not linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (asl)[Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
July 29, 2016 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition to #1 Motion to Quash by Drummond Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27)(Rothenberg, Michael) Modified to add document link on 8/1/2016 (asl). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
July 29, 2016 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 23 restricted/sealed until further notice. (1182951) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
July 29, 2016 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Drummond Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (Text of Proposed Order)) (Rothenberg, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
July 29, 2016 Filing 21 MOTION to Transfer pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(f) re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, by Drummond Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Rothenberg, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) H. Thomas Wells, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 7/29/2016. (eno) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
July 28, 2016 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for H. Thomas Wells, III, Esq.. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-8957408 by Drummond Company, Inc.. Responses due by 8/15/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Certification of H. Thomas Wells, III, Esq.), #2 Exhibit B (Text of Proposed Order))(Rothenberg, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Joint Motion for Entry of Briefing Schedule. Responses due by 7/29/2016. Replies due by 8/19/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 7/1/2016. (eno) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
July 1, 2016 Filing 17 REPORT REGARDING Parties' Efforts to Resolve Dispute and Joint Motion for Entry of Briefing Schedule by Drummond Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Barfield, Brett) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Joint MOTION to Continue and Joint Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 5/27/2016. (eno) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
May 27, 2016 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Continue and Joint Report re #14 Order on Motion for Extension of Time by Drummond Company, Inc.. Responses due by 6/13/2016 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barfield, Brett) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Suspend Briefing Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 4/29/2016. (eno) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
April 29, 2016 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Suspend Briefing Schedule re #10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer, by Drummond Company, Inc.. Responses due by 5/16/2016 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barfield, Brett) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 SECOND JOINT MOTION to Extend Briefing Schedule. Responses due by 5/2/2016. Replies due by 5/16/2016. The Telephonic Hearing set for 5/2/2016 at 11:00 AM is hereby RESET to 5/17/2016 at 2:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 4/6/2016. (eno) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
April 6, 2016 Filing 11 SECOND JOINT MOTION to Extend Briefing Schedule re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, by Drummond Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barfield, Brett) Modified text on 4/7/2016 (jua). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time. Responses due by 4/11/2016. Replies due by 4/25/2016. The Telephonic Hearing set for 3/28/2016 is hereby RESET to 5/2/2016 at 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 3/21/2016. (eno) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
March 21, 2016 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, by Drummond Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rothenberg, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
March 16, 2016 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re #7 Notice of Attorney Appearance. Attorney Did Not Associate Themselves; ERROR - Filing attorney neglected to associate themselves to the case. The Clerk has added the attorney to the case. It is not necessary to refile this document future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures and Local Rules by filing a Notice of Attorney Appearance and linking themselves to the case. (jua) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
March 16, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Evan Rothenberg on behalf of Drummond Company, Inc.. Attorney Michael Evan Rothenberg added to party Drummond Company, Inc.(pty:pla). (Rothenberg, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Telephonic Hearing on #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena to Quash from Another District for 3/28/2016 at 3:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Counsel shall call the conference number 1-888-684-8852 at the appointed time, then enter access code 4791317 and security code 0328. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 3/15/2016. (eno) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for Trial. Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr no longer assigned as presider judge in case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 3/14/2016. (jua) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
March 14, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE by Conrad & Scherer, LLP of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Civil Cover Sheet) (Frevola, Albert) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
March 14, 2016 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (jua) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
March 14, 2016 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr (jua) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]
March 14, 2016 Filing 1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena to Quash from Another District . Filing fee $46.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C-8560161, payment transferred from : 16-mc-60501 Drummond Company, Inc. v. Terrance Collingsworth, filed by Conrad & Scherer, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Frevola, Albert) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/23/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drummond Company, Inc. v. Collingsworth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drummond Company Inc
Represented By: H Thomas Wells, III
Represented By: Brett Alan Barfield
Represented By: Michael Evan Rothenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Douglas Von Allmen
Represented By: Paul Dewey Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrence P Collingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conrad & Scherer, LLP
Represented By: Albert L. Frevola, Jr.
Represented By: Russell Robert O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?