Perry v. Matrix Financial Services Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Annie P Perry
Defendant: Matrix Financial Services Corporation, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc and Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01845
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting the plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to file an amended complaint. #19 Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 1/5/2019. (Ott, John)
January 4, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Motion is RIPE 1/4/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Annie P Perry. (Lay, Kenneth)
December 31, 2018 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Leavens, Ginny)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's #15 motion for leave to file an amended complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file her amended complaint by January 4, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 12/18/2018. (SUH)
December 17, 2018 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement, #15 MOTION for Leave to File amended complaint filed by Matrix Financial Services Corporation, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Leavens, Ginny)
December 10, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File amended complaint by Annie P Perry. (Lay, Kenneth)
December 10, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Annie P Perry. (Lay, Kenneth)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 12/4/2018. (BST, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Annie P Perry, Matrix Financial Services Corporation, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. (BST, )
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge after 1/7/2019 unless the unanimously consent to the jurisdiction of the undersigned magistrate; Telephone Conference set for 12/19/2018 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E Ott; parties to call as directed; if all parties submit an executed consent before 12/19/2018, the telephone conference will be cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 11/28/2018. (KAM)
November 28, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/2/2019. (BST, )
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 11/28/2018. (BST, )
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The court has before it Defendants' #8 motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, motion for more definite statement. Plaintiff SHALL respond to the motion by December 10, 2018, and any reply by Defendants SHALL be filed by December 17, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 11/26/2018. (SUH)
November 21, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement by Matrix Financial Services Corporation, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Leavens, Ginny)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The #6 motion of Matrix Financial Services Corporation for a 7-day extension of time to answer is GRANTED. The answer due 11/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 11/13/2018. (SUH)
November 12, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer UNOPPOSED Motion is RIPE 11/12/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Matrix Financial Services Corporation, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Leavens, Ginny)
November 7, 2018 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, receipt number B4601093380. (JLC)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc (Leavens, Ginny)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Matrix Financial Services Corporation (Leavens, Ginny)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Leavens, Ginny)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationstar Mortgage LLC from Circuit Court of Shelby County, Alabama, case number 58-cv-2018-900923, filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. Matrix Financial Services Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matrix Financial Services Corporation
Represented By: Gregory C Cook
Represented By: Ginny Willcox Leavens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc
Represented By: Gregory C Cook
Represented By: Ginny Willcox Leavens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Gregory C Cook
Represented By: Ginny Willcox Leavens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie P Perry
Represented By: Kenneth J Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?