Estate of Essie McElrath, The v. Birmingham Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC
Plaintiff: Estate of Essie McElrath, The
Defendant: Birmingham Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01849
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Estate of Essie McElrath, The. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Toya Spencer, #2 Affidavit Erskine McElrath)(Diamond, Seth)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration #4 . In light of the holidays, the parties are DIRECTED to brief the issues raised in the motion as follows: (1) Plaintiff SHALL respond on or before December 21, 2018; (2) Defendant MAY reply on or before January 9, 2019. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/12/2018. (KEK)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 Brief re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Egbe, Jennifer)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Birmingham Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC. (Egbe, Jennifer)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/13/2018. (KAM)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Birmingham Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC.(Sproule, R)
November 8, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3213853 (ALND B4601093388) related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Birmingham Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2018-904014, filed by Birmingham Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(KEK). (Sproule, R) Modified on 11/8/2018 (KEK).
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Birmingham Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2018-904014, filed by Birmingham Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Essie McElrath, The v. Birmingham Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birmingham Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Reid Egbe
Represented By: R Gordon Sproule, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Essie McElrath, The
Represented By: Charles Clyde Tatum, Jr
Represented By: Seth L Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?