Alabama State Conference of the NAACP et al v. Pleasant Grove, City of et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Ford, Alabama State Conference of the NAACP and Eric Calhoun
Defendant: Pleasant Grove, City of, Philip Houston, Kenneth Hatfield, William Bullion, James Crumpton, Paula Johnson and Jerry W Brasseale
Case Number: 2:2018cv02056
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Referring Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay (Opposed) by Jerry W Brasseale, William Bullion, James Crumpton, Kenneth Hatfield, Philip Houston, Paula Johnson, Pleasant Grove, City of. (Canupp, David)
February 8, 2019 Filing 15 Brief re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jerry W Brasseale, William Bullion, James Crumpton, Kenneth Hatfield, Philip Houston, Paula Johnson, Pleasant Grove, City of. (Canupp, David)
February 8, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Jerry W Brasseale, William Bullion, James Crumpton, Kenneth Hatfield, Philip Houston, Paula Johnson, Pleasant Grove, City of. (Attachments: #1 2013-2017 ACS 5-Year Estimates, #2 Certified Pleasant Grove Voter Registration Statistics)(Canupp, David)
February 6, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge L Scott Coogler: Telephone Conference held on 2/6/2019. (PSM)
February 4, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 2/6/2019 at 9:00 AM before Judge L Scott Coogler. Counsel are to call (877) 336-1828 and use Access Code: 1966344 five (5) minutes prior to the start of the conference.(PSM)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 2/4/2019. (PSM)
February 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge L Scott Coogler. Magistrate Judge John H England, III no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 2:18-cv-02056-LSC for all subsequent pleadings. (AFS)
January 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James Bradley Emmons on behalf of Jerry W Brasseale, William Bullion, James Crumpton, Kenneth Hatfield, Philip Houston, Paula Johnson, Pleasant Grove, City of (Emmons, James)
January 17, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $50.00, (ALND B4601094814) receipt number 1126-3258453. (Morris, John) Modified on 1/17/2019 (AFS).
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice attorney John Z. Morris, but with the understanding and on the condition he pay the applicable fee and register for e-filing and notification within 14 days, unless he has already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 1/17/2019. (AVC)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice John Z. Morris Motion is RIPE 1/16/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Alabama State Conference of the NAACP, Eric Calhoun, Jennifer Ford. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Morris declaration, #2 Exhibit Morris certificate of standing, #3 Exhibit Blacksher consent, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Blacksher, James)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' responsive pleading is due February 8, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 01/07/2019. (CLS2)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time (UNOPPOSED) Motion is RIPE 1/7/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Jerry W Brasseale, William Bullion, James Crumpton, Kenneth Hatfield, Philip Houston, Paula Johnson, Pleasant Grove, City of. (Canupp, David)
January 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Pleasant Grove, City of answer due 1/9/2019. (KEK)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Consent to Magistrate Judge Form served on Debby Patterson o/b/o City of Pleasant Grove on 12/19/2018, filed by Alabama State Conference of the NAACP, Eric Calhoun, Jennifer Ford. (Ross, Deuel) Modified on 1/4/2019 (KEK).
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jerry W Brasseale, William Bullion, James Crumpton, Kenneth Hatfield, Philip Houston, Paula Johnson, City of Pleasant Grove, returned to Plaintiff's attorney for service on this the 20th day of December, 2018. (JLC)
December 17, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $50.00, ALND (B4601094164) receipt number 1126-3238826. (Aden, Leah) Modified on 12/17/2018 (AFS).
December 14, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $50.00, (ALND B4601094158) receipt number 1126-3238044. (Ross, Deuel) Modified on 12/17/2018 (AFS).
December 14, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $50.00, (ALND B4601094157) receipt number 1126-3238022. (Meza, Catherine) Modified on 12/14/2018 (AFS).
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice attorneys Catherine Meza, Deuel Ross and Leah Aden, but with the understanding and on the condition they pay the applicable fee and register for e-filing and notification within 14 days, unless they have already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 12/14/2018. (AVC)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice Meza, Ross, Aden Motion is RIPE 12/14/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Alabama State Conference of the NAACP, Eric Calhoun, Jennifer Ford. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Blacksher consent local counsel, #2 Affidavit Meza declaration, #3 Exhibit Meza certificate, #4 Affidavit Ross declaration, #5 Exhibit Ross certificate, #6 Affidavit Aden declaration, #7 Exhibit Aden certificate, #8 Text of Proposed Order Joint PHV)(Blacksher, James)
December 14, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $400.00, (ALND B4601094129) receipt_number 1126-3237324. related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alabama State Conference of the NAACP.(AFS). (Blacksher, James) Modified on 12/17/2018 (AFS).
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alabama State Conference of the NAACP.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alabama State Conference of the NAACP et al v. Pleasant Grove, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Ford
Represented By: James Uriah Blacksher
Represented By: Deuel Ross
Represented By: Catherine Meza
Represented By: Leah C Aden
Represented By: John Zachery Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alabama State Conference of the NAACP
Represented By: James Uriah Blacksher
Represented By: Deuel Ross
Represented By: Catherine Meza
Represented By: Leah C Aden
Represented By: John Zachery Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Calhoun
Represented By: James Uriah Blacksher
Represented By: Deuel Ross
Represented By: Catherine Meza
Represented By: Leah C Aden
Represented By: John Zachery Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pleasant Grove, City of
Represented By: Jonathan D Terry
Represented By: James Bradley Emmons
Represented By: Jon B Terry
Represented By: David J Canupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Houston
Represented By: Jonathan D Terry
Represented By: James Bradley Emmons
Represented By: Jon B Terry
Represented By: David J Canupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Hatfield
Represented By: Jonathan D Terry
Represented By: James Bradley Emmons
Represented By: Jon B Terry
Represented By: David J Canupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Bullion
Represented By: Jonathan D Terry
Represented By: James Bradley Emmons
Represented By: Jon B Terry
Represented By: David J Canupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Crumpton
Represented By: Jonathan D Terry
Represented By: James Bradley Emmons
Represented By: Jon B Terry
Represented By: David J Canupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Johnson
Represented By: Jonathan D Terry
Represented By: James Bradley Emmons
Represented By: Jon B Terry
Represented By: David J Canupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry W Brasseale
Represented By: Jonathan D Terry
Represented By: James Bradley Emmons
Represented By: Jon B Terry
Represented By: David J Canupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?