Smith v. BMW Financial Services NA LLC

Plaintiff: Joshua M Smith
Defendant: BMW Financial Services NA LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00034
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
0 Judge: Staci G Cornelius
1 Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/22/2019. (KAM)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable R. David Proctor. Please use case number 2:19-34-RDP on all subsequent pleadings. Case Reassigned to Judge Judge R David Proctor. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Joshua M Smith.(Seals, W)
February 18, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BMW Financial Services NA LLC. filed by BMW Financial Services NA LLC (Bottcher, Christopher)
February 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BMW Financial Services NA LLC.(Bottcher, Christopher)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER- This court cannot take jurisdiction of this matter until the citizenship of each party is properly alleged; Pltf is ORDERED to amend his complaint by February 22, 2019, to correct the deficiencies in the jurisdictional allegations stated within; The amended complaint SHALL be complete and not incorporate by reference or refer back to a previously filed document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/11/19. (MRR, )
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed BMW Financial Services NA LLC served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/18/2019. (MRR, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BMW Financial Services NA LLC. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
January 8, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3250598 (B4601094584). related document #1 COMPLAINT against BMW Financial Services NA LLC, filed by Joshua M Smith.(MRR, ). (Seals, W) Modified on 1/9/2019 (MRR, ).
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
January 8, 2019 Request for service by certified mail within the body of the complaint filed by Joshua M Smith. (MRR, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BMW Financial Services NA LLC, filed by Joshua M Smith.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. BMW Financial Services NA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW Financial Services NA LLC
Represented By: Christopher A Bottcher
Represented By: T Dylan Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua M Smith
Represented By: John C Hubbard
Represented By: W Whitney Seals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?