Klingenbeck v. Life Time Fitness Inc

Plaintiff: Johnathan Brooks Klingenbeck
Defendant: Life Time Fitness Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00037
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 2/27/2019. (PSM)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/5/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 9/4/2019. Joint Status Report due by 8/19/2019. Jury Trial set for 2/10/2020 at 9:00 AM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge L Scott Coogler. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 2/20/2019. (PSM)
February 15, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Life Time Fitness Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Creel, Thomas)
February 15, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Creel, Thomas)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Before the Court is Plaintiff's First Motion to Remand. #5 For the reasons stated during the telephone conference held on February 7, 2019, the Court finds it has jurisdiction. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #5 is DENIED.Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 2/7/2019. (PSM)
February 7, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge L Scott Coogler: Telephone Conference held on 2/7/2019. (PSM)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #4 Motion for Limited Admission. Attorney Harris R. Frank has notified the Court that he was admitted to practice in the Northern District of Alabama on January 31, 2019. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on February 6, 2019. (EBV)
February 5, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 2/7/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge L Scott Coogler. Counsel are to call (877) 336-1831 and use Access Code: 2018089 five (5) minutes prior to the start of the conference.(PSM)
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ike Gulas on behalf of Johnathan Brooks Klingenbeck (Gulas, Ike)
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 ***Document Sealed Exhibit 1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit sealed) (TLM, )
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on January 22, 2019. (EBV)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Seal by Life Time Fitness Inc. (Creel, Thomas)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 First MOTION to Remand to State Court in Jefferson County, Alabama filed by Life Time Fitness Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Creel, Thomas)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION to Remand to State Court in Jefferson County, Alabama by Johnathan Brooks Klingenbeck. (Gulas, Ike)
January 14, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number B4601094733. (Gulas, Ike)
January 14, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge L Scott Coogler: Telephone Conference held on 1/14/2019. (PSM)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION for Limited Admission to admit non-admitted attorney pro hac vice by Johnathan Brooks Klingenbeck. (Gulas, Ike)
January 10, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 1/14/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge L Scott Coogler. Counsel are to call (877) 336-1828 and use Access Code 3967498 five (5) minutes prior to the start of the conference.(PSM)
January 10, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge L Scott Coogler: Telephone Conference held on 1/10/2019. (PSM)
January 9, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 1/10/2019 at 2:00 PM before Judge L Scott Coogler. Counsel are to call (877) 336-1828 and use Access Code 3967498 five (5) minutes prior to the start of the conference.(PSM)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 1/8/2019. (PSM)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Life Time Fitness Inc (PSM)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Life Time Fitness Inc from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-CV-2018-904787., filed by Life Time Fitness Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Removal)(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klingenbeck v. Life Time Fitness Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Time Fitness Inc
Represented By: David S. Manush
Represented By: Thomas S Creel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnathan Brooks Klingenbeck
Represented By: Ike Gulas
Represented By: Harris Robert Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?