N. v. Jefferson County Board of Education

Plaintiff: J. N.
Defendant: Jefferson County Board of Education
Case Number: 2:2019cv00047
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Defendant Jefferson County Board of Education's Counterclaim by J. N..(Sears, Shane)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS reminding parties of their obligations under FRCP26(f)- with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 1/25/2019. (KSS)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/24/2019; Pretrial Conference set for 6/4/2020 at 3:00 PM; Bench Trial set for 7/20/2020 09:00 AM; BOTH in the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 1/24/2019. (AFS)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against J. N. by Jefferson County Board of Education.(Johnson, Carl)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Notice of Acceptance of Service of Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Acknowledgement filed by Jefferson County Board of Education. (Johnson, Carl)
January 10, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number B4601094632 (AFS)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 Evidentiary Material re: #1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Final Order by Hearing Officer, #2 Exhibit Hearing Transcript, #3 Exhibit Due Process Complaint)(Sears, Shane)
January 9, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3252226. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Jefferson County Board of Education, filed by J. N..(AFS). (Sears, Shane)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jefferson County Board of Education, filed by J. N..(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N. v. Jefferson County Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. N.
Represented By: Shane T Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County Board of Education
Represented By: Carl E Johnson, Jr
Represented By: Andrew Ethan Rudloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?