Cole v. Gestamp North America Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Tamitra Cole
Defendant: Gestamp North America Inc., Will Smith, Sonya Greene and Gestamp Alabama, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00056
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ORDER - NOTICE: The motion #15 will be treated as a motion for summary judgment pursuant to Rule 56. It appears Plaintiff has noted this and responded accordingly. However, to the extent she has not already done so in her response, Plaintiff has until March 14, 2019 to file any additional evidence. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 03/07/2019. (CLS2)
March 7, 2019 Filing 29 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (AFS)
March 7, 2019 NOTICE the telephone consent conference set for today at 10:00 a.m. is CANCELLED. (AFS)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER to STRIKE document 27 . The telephone conference remains set for March 7, 2019 at 10:00 AM. The consent deadline is March 21, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 3/6/2019. (AFS)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER: The Court ordered the parties to submit consent forms declaring whether they consent or decline dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge on or before March 7, 2019. (Doc. #9 ). Fewer than all parties have submitted forms. The parties are REQUIRED to submit forms by Thursday, March 7, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 03/05/2019. (CLS2)
March 5, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to re #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Will Smith. (Flowers, Ronald)
March 5, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sonya Greene. (Flowers, Ronald)
March 5, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY to re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Gestamp Alabama, LLC, Gestamp North America Inc.. (Flowers, Ronald)
March 4, 2019 Filing 23 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Sonya Greene. (AFS)
February 21, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motions to Dismiss #15 , #16 and #17 filed by Tamitra Cole. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Rutledge, W) Modified on 2/21/2019 (AFS).
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER setting motion deadline for #15 Motion to Dismiss; #16 Motion to Dismiss; and #17 Motion to Dismiss. Any opposition to the motions must be filed by March 5, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 02/02/2019. (CLS2)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion to Stay to the extent explained. The requirements of Rule 26 and document 10 are STAYED. If there is unanimous consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction, the deadlines are stayed through resolution of the motions to dismiss. If this case is reassigned to a district judge based on a lack of unanimous consent, the district judge may reconsider the stay of these deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 02/19/2019. (CLS2)
February 19, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Stay Initial Disclosures and Parties' Planning Meeting Pending Rulings on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss re #10 Order by Gestamp Alabama, LLC, Gestamp North America Inc., Sonya Greene, Will Smith. (Flowers, Ronald)
February 19, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gestamp Alabama, LLC. filed by Gestamp Alabama, LLC (Flowers, Ronald)
February 19, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Sonya Greene. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Flowers, Ronald)
February 19, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Will Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Flowers, Ronald)
February 19, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment by Gestamp Alabama, LLC, Gestamp North America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(Flowers, Ronald)
February 15, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed Gestamp Alabama, LLC served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (AFS)
February 8, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Gestamp Alabama, LLC. mailed certified mail. (AFS)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER terming as MOOT #6 Motion to Dismiss or, alternatively Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants are instructed to respond to the Amended Complaint in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(c). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 02/06/2019. (CLS2)
February 5, 2019 Request for service by certified mail within the First Amended Complaint filed by Tamitra Cole. (AFS)
February 5, 2019 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tamitra Cole.(Rutledge, W)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26.(f) Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 2/5/2019. (AFS)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than 3/21/2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after 3/21/2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on March 7, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 2/5/2019. (AFS)
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gestamp North America Inc.. filed by Gestamp North America Inc. (Flowers, Ronald)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER setting motion deadline for #6 Motion to Dismiss or, alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment. Any opposition to the motion must be filed by February 25, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 02/05/2019. (CLS2)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, MOTION for summary judgment by Gestamp North America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Flowers, Ronald)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Gestamp North America Inc. served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (AFS)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Gestamp North America Inc., Sonya Greene, Will Smith mailed certified mail. (AFS)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Tamitra Cole. (AFS)
January 10, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $400.00, (ALND B4601094674) receipt_number 1126-3252834. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Gestamp North America Inc., Sonya Greene, Will Smith, filed by Tamitra Cole.(AFS). (Rutledge, W) Modified on 1/11/2019 (AFS).
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gestamp North America Inc., Sonya Greene, Will Smith, filed by Tamitra Cole.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. Gestamp North America Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gestamp North America Inc.
Represented By: Ronald W Flowers, Jr
Represented By: Henry Carlton Hilson
Represented By: Marcel L Debruge
Represented By: Ronald D. Scott Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Smith
Represented By: Henry Carlton Hilson
Represented By: Marcel L Debruge
Represented By: Ronald D. Scott Williams
Represented By: Ronald W Flowers, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonya Greene
Represented By: Henry Carlton Hilson
Represented By: Marcel L Debruge
Represented By: Ronald D. Scott Williams
Represented By: Ronald W Flowers, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gestamp Alabama, LLC
Represented By: Henry Carlton Hilson
Represented By: Marcel L Debruge
Represented By: Ronald D. Scott Williams
Represented By: Ronald W Flowers, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamitra Cole
Represented By: W Eugene Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?