Crenshaw v. Cardinal Health Inc et al

Plaintiff: Sally Crenshaw
Defendant: Cardinal Health 200 LLC and Cardinal Health Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00063
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: T Michael Putnam
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health Inc. filed by Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health Inc (Miller, Shannon)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health Inc.(Miller, Shannon)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time and giving 21 additional days to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on January 31, 2019.(TNC)
January 30, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Motion is RIPE 1/30/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health Inc. (Miller, Shannon)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed All Defendants, (no date entered on green card) (MRR, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health Inc. mailed certified mail (TLM, )
January 11, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3254207 (B4601094724). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sally Crenshaw. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(MRR, ). (Rouco, Richard) Modified on 1/14/2019 (MRR, ).
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
January 11, 2019 Request for service by certified mail within the body of the complaint filed by Sally Crenshaw. (MRR, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sally Crenshaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crenshaw v. Cardinal Health Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 200 LLC
Represented By: Shannon L Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Represented By: Shannon L Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Crenshaw
Represented By: Richard P Rouco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?