Pettway v. Monsanto Company

Plaintiff: Hardy Pettway
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00093
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 Alias Summons Issued 2/25/2019 as to Monsanto Company delivered to plaintiff for service (KAM)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company delivered to plaintiff for service (KAM)
January 23, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3261572. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company, filed by Hardy Pettway.(KAM). (DiLorenzo, Joel)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company, filed by Hardy Pettway.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pettway v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hardy Pettway
Represented By: Joel Lee DiLorenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?