Bunker v. JMCA Inc

Plaintiff: Michael Bunker
Defendant: JMCA Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00094
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
0 Judge: Karon O Bowdre
1 Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Michael Bunker of SETTLEMENT (Hussey, Curtis)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with appendices attached. **The report also should contain a synopsis of the case advising the court of the general claims and defenses of the parties. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 3/13/2019. (FNC)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre. Magistrate Judge John H England, III no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 2:19-cv-00094-KOB on all subsequent pleadings. The status conference scheduled for 4/1/2019 is CANCELLED. (AFS)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 3/4/2019. (AFS)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than 4/15/2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after 4/15/2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on April 1, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 19-94. (AFS)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM against Michael Bunker by JMCA Inc.(Francis, J)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Bunker. JMCA Inc served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019. (Hussey, Curtis)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JMCA Inc. mailed by to Plaintiff's counsel in SASE for service. (AFS)
January 17, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $400.00, (ALND B4601094820) receipt_number 1126-3258645. related document #1 COMPLAINT against JMCA Inc, filed by Michael Bunker.(AFS). (Hussey, Curtis) Modified on 1/17/2019 (AFS).
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JMCA Inc, filed by Michael Bunker.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bunker v. JMCA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JMCA Inc
Represented By: J Timothy Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bunker
Represented By: Curtis Hussey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?